This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 06:04:41 (UTC).

CREW v. GSA

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 CREW filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against GSA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5134

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

General Services Administration

Plaintiff / Appellee

Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Sharon Swingle

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Melanie Dyani Hendry

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Thomas Gary Pulham

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Anne Louise Weismann

Attorney at Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

1101 K Street, Nw, Suite 201

Washington, DC 20005

Laura C. Beckerman

Attorney at Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

1101 K Street, Nw, Suite 201

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1791974] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:55 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1791973] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:53 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1791972] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:51 PM]

Open Document #2

March 5, 2019 Memroandum Opinion and Order

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791969] filed by Melanie D. Hendry and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellant GSA. [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:41 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791968] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:39 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1791966] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:37 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791523] filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] [19-5134] (Rappaport, Adam) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791521] filed by Anne L. Weismann and co-counsel Laura C. Beckerman on behalf of Appellee Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. [19-5134] (Rappaport, Adam) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1789428] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellant GSA. [19-5134] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:55 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1787190] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:25 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787187] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00377-CRC filed by GSA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5134. [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:17 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1791974] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1791973] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1791972] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1791971] submitted by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791969] filed by Melanie D. Hendry and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellant GSA. [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791968] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1791966] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791523] filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] [19-5134] (Rappaport, Adam) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791521] filed by Anne L. Weismann and co-counsel Laura C. Beckerman on behalf of Appellee Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. [19-5134] (Rappaport, Adam) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1789428] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellant GSA. [19-5134] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1787190] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787187] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00377-CRC filed by GSA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5134. [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.