This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2022 at 06:00:25 (UTC).

Credit One Bank NA v. Adam Lieberman, et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Credit One Bank NA filed an Other lawsuit against Adam Lieberman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1871

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

CREDIT ONE BANK NA

Defendant / Appellants

ADAM LIEBERMAN

Lakewood, NJ 08701

GENESE LIEBERMAN

Lakewood, NJ 08701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Andrew J. Soven Esq.

Attorney at Holland & Knight

2929 Arch Street, Suite 800

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Adam Lieberman

1072 Madison Avenue

Lakewood, NJ 08701

Genese Lieberman

1072 Madison Avenue

Lakewood, NJ 08701

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Order

1 #3

District Court Opinion

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

3 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

3 #2

Briefing Info for Pro Se Litigants

#3

Standing Order Excess Pagination

#4

(#4) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Andrew J. Soven, Esq. for Credit One Bank NA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/08/2022. (JK) [Entered: 05/25/2022 03:44 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION filed by Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix until 08/22/2022. Response due on 06/21/2022. Certificate of Service dated 06/08/2022. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:50 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew J. Soven on behalf of Appellee(s) Credit One Bank, N.A.. [22-1871] (AJS) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:00 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Credit One Bank NA. [22-1871] (AJS) [Entered: 06/10/2022 01:45 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Credit One Bank NA to motion. Certificate of Service dated 06/10/2022. [22-1871] (AJS) [Entered: 06/10/2022 01:56 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the Appellee's Response and Appellants' motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix. (JK) [Entered: 06/21/2022 09:37 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER (MATEY, Circuit Judge) granting in part the motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman. Appellants shall have a 45 day extension from the date of this order. Panel No.: DCO-086. MATEY, Authoring Judge. (JK) [Entered: 06/24/2022 10:53 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (MATEY, Circuit Judge) granting in part the motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman. Appellants shall have a 45 day extension from the date of this order. Panel No.: DCO-086. MATEY, Authoring Judge. (JK) [Entered: 06/24/2022 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the Appellee's Response and Appellants' motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix. (JK) [Entered: 06/21/2022 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Credit One Bank NA to motion. Certificate of Service dated 06/10/2022. [22-1871] (AJS) [Entered: 06/10/2022 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Credit One Bank NA. [22-1871] (AJS) [Entered: 06/10/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew J. Soven on behalf of Appellee(s) Credit One Bank, N.A.. [22-1871] (AJS) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION filed by Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appendix until 08/22/2022. Response due on 06/21/2022. Certificate of Service dated 06/08/2022. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Andrew J. Soven, Esq. for Credit One Bank NA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/08/2022. (JK) [Entered: 05/25/2022 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman due on or before 06/21/2022. Appendix due on or before 06/21/2022. (JK) [Entered: 05/12/2022 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Adam Lieberman and Genese Lieberman in District Court No. 3-21-cv-02923. (JK) [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit One Bank, N.A. is a litigant