This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/04/2020 at 06:09:41 (UTC).

Crane v. Utah Department of Corrections, et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Crane filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Utah Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4032

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FUTURES THROUGH CHOICES, a Private corporation

JOHN DEWITT, the Director of Juvenile Justice

JEREMY COTTLE, the CEO and Managing Director of Provo Canyon School

FNU COX, a Correctional Officer at Central Utah Correctional Facility

RICHARD GARDEN, Director of the Clinical Services Bureau for the Utah Department of Corrections

BRENT PLATT, the Director of Utah Division of Child and Family Services

UTAH DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

DON TAYLOR, an Inmate Disciplinary Officer at the Central Utah Correctional Facility

ALFRED BIGELOW, Warden of the Central Utah Correctional Facility

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC., a Private for-Profit Corporation

SUSAN BURKE

Plaintiff / Appellant

JANET CRANE, as Administrator of Brock Tucker's Estate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Phillip S. Ferguson

Attorney at Christensen & Jensen

257 East 200 South, Suite 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Sarah E. Spencer

Attorney at Christensen & Jensen

257 East 200 South, Suite 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Sarah Elizabeth Spencer

Attorney at Christensen & Jensen

257 East 200 South, Suite 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Scott D. Cheney

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Utah

160 East 300 South, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 140854

Salt Lake City, UT 84114

Shelley M. Doi-Taketa

Attorney at Hall Prangle & Schoonveld

111 East Broadway, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Heather J. Chesnut

Attorney at Utah Attorney General's Office

160 East 300 South, 5Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84114-0858

Joshua Daniel Davidson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Utah

160 East 300 South, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 140854

Salt Lake City, UT 84114

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Randall W. Richards

Attorney at Richards & Brown

938 University Park Boulevard, Suite 140

Clearfield, UT 84015

Emily A. Swenson

2661 Washington Boulevard, Suite 103

Ogden, UT 84401

Samuel Weiss

Attorney at Rights Behind Bars

416 Florida Avenue Nw, Unit 26152

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10729553] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance (or non-participation) now due on 04/03/2020 for Jeremy Cottle. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/31/2020 01:58 PM]

Open Document

[10728980] Entry of appearance filed by Phillip S. Ferguson and Sarah E. Spencer for Futures Through Choices. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/27/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] [Entered: 03/30/2020 06:33 AM]

Open Document

[10728320] Entry of appearance filed by Samuel Weiss for Janet Crane. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/25/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] [Entered: 03/26/2020 07:00 AM]

Open Document

[10727926] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 03/27/2020 for Janet Crane. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:19 PM]

Open Document

[10727331] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/23/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/04/2020 for Janet Crane. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/23/2020 11:45 AM]

Open Document

[10726346] Entry of appearance filed by Joshua Daniel Davidson for Utah Department of Corrections, Don Taylor, Brent Platt, Doctor Richard Garden, Cox, Susan Burke and Alfred Bigelow. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/17/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] [Entered: 03/18/2020 06:43 AM]

Open Document

[10726082] Docketing statement filed by Janet Crane. Served on 03/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4032] RWR [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:10 AM]

Open Document

[10725665] Notice received from Janet Crane that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 03/16/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] RWR [Entered: 03/16/2020 08:30 AM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter With Counsel

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10729553] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance (or non-participation) now due on 04/03/2020 for Jeremy Cottle. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/31/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10728980] Entry of appearance filed by Phillip S. Ferguson and Sarah E. Spencer for Futures Through Choices. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/27/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] [Entered: 03/30/2020 06:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket[10728957] Entry of appearance submitted by Phillip S. Ferguson, Sarah E. Spencer for Appellee Futures Through Choices for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4032]--[Edited 03/30/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 3/30/20] SES [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10728320] Entry of appearance filed by Samuel Weiss for Janet Crane. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/25/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] [Entered: 03/26/2020 07:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket[10728311] Entry of appearance submitted by Samuel David Kinder Weiss for Appellant Janet Crane for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/26/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 3/26/20][20-4032] SW [Entered: 03/25/2020 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket[10727931] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance or of non-participation due on 03/27/2020 for Jeremy Cottle and Futures Through Choices. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4032] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10727926] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 03/27/2020 for Janet Crane. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10727331] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/23/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/04/2020 for Janet Crane. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/23/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10726346] Entry of appearance filed by Joshua Daniel Davidson for Utah Department of Corrections, Don Taylor, Brent Platt, Doctor Richard Garden, Cox, Susan Burke and Alfred Bigelow. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/17/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] [Entered: 03/18/2020 06:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket[10726340] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua D. Davidson for Appellees Mr. Alfred Bigelow, Susan Burke, Cox, Doctor Richard Garden, Brent Platt, Mr. Don Taylor and Utah Department of Corrections for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4032]--[Edited 03/18/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 3/18/20.] JDD [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10726082] Docketing statement filed by Janet Crane. Served on 03/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4032] RWR [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket[10725806] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 03/23/2020 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4032] [Entered: 03/16/2020 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10725665] Notice received from Janet Crane that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 03/16/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4032] RWR [Entered: 03/16/2020 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10723116] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/05/2020. Docketing statement due 03/19/2020 for Janet Crane. Transcript order form due 03/19/2020 for Janet Crane. Notice of appearance due on 03/19/2020 for Universal Health Services Inc. [20-4032] [Entered: 03/05/2020 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Utah Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall W Richards

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily A. Swenson