This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/23/2022 at 06:19:28 (UTC).

C.R. Bard, Inc. v. Medical Components, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 C R Bard, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Medical Components, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1186

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

C.R. BARD, INC.

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Steven Cherny

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

111 Huntington Avenue

Boston, MA 02199

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Alfred W. Zaher Esq. I

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

1735 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-1136 Lead with 22-1186 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [814686] [22-1136, 22-1186] [JCW] [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/23/2021. [814681] Entry of Appearance is due on 12/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/08/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 12/08/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 01/24/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant