This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/11/2022 at 06:02:43 (UTC).

Cozzini Bros., Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Cozzini Bros , Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1034

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

COZZINI BROS., INC.

Defendant / Appellee

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John M. Owen

Attorney at CHAPMAN SPINGOLA LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603-3410

Robert A. Chapman

Attorney at CHAPMAN SPINGOLA LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603-3410

Robert J. Shapiro

Attorney at CHAPMAN SPINGOLA LLP

190 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603-3410

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brian M. Reid

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7211164] [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 01/14/2022 10:19 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian M. Reid for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company. [3] [7212067] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034] (Reid, Brian) [Entered: 01/19/2022 03:32 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [4] [7212331] [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:37 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney.John M Owen for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [5] [7214143] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:02 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert A. Chapman for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [6] [7214499] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034] [Edited 02/01/2022 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Chapman, Robert) [Entered: 01/31/2022 05:38 PM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert J. Shapiro for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [7] [7214500] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034]--[Edited 02/01/2022 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Shapiro, Robert) [Entered: 01/31/2022 05:44 PM]

#9

(#9) Motion filed by Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc. to extend time to file appellant brief. [9] [7218696] [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:44 PM]

#10

(#10) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief only to the extent that Appellant's brief due on or before 03/31/2022 for Cozzini Bros., Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/02/2022 for Cincinnati Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/23/2022 for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc. Counsel for the appellant is reminded that motions for extension of time should be filed at least seven days before the brief is due. Cir. R. 26. CMD [10] [7219712] [22-1034] (AG) [Entered: 02/28/2022 09:07 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief only to the extent that Appellant's brief due on or before 03/31/2022 for Cozzini Bros., Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/02/2022 for Cincinnati Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/23/2022 for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc. Counsel for the appellant is reminded that motions for extension of time should be filed at least seven days before the brief is due. Cir. R. 26. CMD [10] [7219712] [22-1034] (AG) [Entered: 02/28/2022 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion filed by Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc. to extend time to file appellant brief. [9] [7218696] [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Robert J. Shapiro for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [8] [7217908] [22-1034] (LJ) [Entered: 02/17/2022 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert J. Shapiro for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [7] [7214500] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034]--[Edited 02/01/2022 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Shapiro, Robert) [Entered: 01/31/2022 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert A. Chapman for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [6] [7214499] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034] [Edited 02/01/2022 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Chapman, Robert) [Entered: 01/31/2022 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney.John M Owen for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [5] [7214143] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. [4] [7212331] [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian M. Reid for Appellee Cincinnati Insurance Company. [3] [7212067] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1034] (Reid, Brian) [Entered: 01/19/2022 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7211164] [22-1034] (Owen, John) [Entered: 01/14/2022 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Cozzini Bros., Inc. by 01/14/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 01/24/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/22/2022 for Cozzini Bros., Inc. [1] [7209991] [22-1034] (ER) [Entered: 01/10/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M. Reid