This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/31/2021 at 06:13:34 (UTC).

Coy Cook v. Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Coy Cook filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16831

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

COY COOK

Defendant / Appellee

LAS VEGAS RESORT HOLDINGS, LLC, dba SLS Las Vegas, a foreign limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Julian Mcavoyamaya Esquire

4539 Paseo Del Ray

Las Vegas, NV 89121

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Patrick H. Hicks

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Coy Cook Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/08/2021. [12281013] [21-16831] (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:14 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) Terminated Emil S. Kim for Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC in 21-16831 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [12324943] (RY) [Entered: 12/27/2021 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/08/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12281203]. [21-16831] (AD) [Entered: 11/08/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Coy Cook Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/08/2021. [12281013] [21-16831] (Mcavoyamaya, Michael) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Coy Cook Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/08/2021. Transcript ordered by 11/29/2021. Transcript due 12/29/2021. Appellant Coy Cook opening brief due 02/07/2022. Appellee Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC answering brief due 03/09/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12274148] (HH) [Entered: 11/01/2021 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less