This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/26/2021 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

Couturier v. Bard Peripheral Vascular

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Couturier filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bard Peripheral Vascular. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-30537

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Craig Couturier

Defendant / Appellees

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated

C. R. Bard, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, P.L.L.C.

3141 Hood Street

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lori Gail Cohen

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

3333 Piedmont Road, N.E.Terminus 200

Atlanta, GA 30305

Timothy E. Di Domenico

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

445 Hamilton Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

Justin Lewis Bernstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Charles Wade Bowden

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

777 S. Flagler Drive

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

333 S.E. 2Nd Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Joseph P. Griffith

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenuejp Morgan Chase Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Jesse Wadell Wainwright

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Kim E. Moore Esq.

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, L.L.C.

400 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Sylvia Simson

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

200 Park Avenuemetlife Building

New York, NY 10166

Charles Mark Stratton Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.

300 W. 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Attorney Appearance Filed

Open Document #2

Attachment to Notice of Appearance in Couturier

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. Transcript Order form due to be filed by 10/28/2021, for Appellant Craig Couturier.[21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/13/2021 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT ORDER of 10/04/2021, denying motion for new trial. [21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/13/2021 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joseph P. Griffith for Appellees C. R. Bard, Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated in 21-30537. [21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/28/2021 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jesse Wadell Wainwright for Appellees Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated and C. R. Bard, Incorporated, in case 21-30537. [21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/24/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30537] (Joseph P. Griffith ) [Entered: 09/24/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Mr. Joseph P. Griffith for Appellees C. R. Bard, Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated is advised to resubmit an appearance form. [21-30537] (CJM) [Entered: 09/23/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30537] (Jesse Wadell Wainwright ) [Entered: 09/23/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30537] (Joseph P. Griffith ) [Entered: 09/22/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Lori Gail Cohen for Appellees C. R. Bard, Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated in 21-30537. [21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/16/2021 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Justin Lewis Bernstein for Appellees Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated and C. R. Bard, Incorporated, in case 21-30537. [21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30537] (Justin Lewis Bernstein ) [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Lori Gail Cohen for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Incorporated and C. R. Bard, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30537] (Lori Gail Cohen ) [Entered: 09/15/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for ruling on Motion for New Trial filed 08/26/2021, District Court document number 358. [9660411-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-30537] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/09/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Craig Couturier [21-30537] (MCS) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Mark Stratton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Wade Bowden