This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:24 (UTC).

Courtenay Miller v. Donna Bruenger

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Courtenay Miller filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Donna Bruenger. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5763

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

COURTENAY ANN MILLER

Defendant / Appellee

DONNA RUTH BRUENGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen P. Imhoff

Attorney at Imhoff Law Office

2843 Brownsboro Road, Suite 101

Louisville, KY 40206

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kirk Hoskins

Attorney at Law Office

1387 S. Fourth Street

Louisville, KY 40208

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/26/2019. appellee brief now due 10/25/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:31 PM]

#17

(#17) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Certificate of Service:08/05/2019. [19-5763] (SPI) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:09 PM]

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/12/2019. appellee brief now due 10/11/2019. (MLB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:48 AM]

#12

(#12) The Mediation Conference has been rescheduled as an In-person Conference on 08/29/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:46 AM]

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller Certificate of Service: 08/02/2019. [19-5763] (SPI) [Entered: 08/02/2019 06:04 PM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller by Stephen P. Imhoff. Certificate of Service: 07/31/2019. [19-5763] (SPI) [Entered: 07/31/2019 05:16 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Kirk Hoskins for Appellee Donna Ruth Bruenger Certificate of Service: 07/20/2019. [19-5763] (KH) [Entered: 07/20/2019 12:56 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Donna Ruth Bruenger by Kirk Hoskins. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2019. [19-5763] (KH) [Entered: 07/20/2019 12:54 PM]

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

appearance form

#5

(#5) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:23 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/26/2019;. appellee brief due 09/24/2019; (MMD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:46 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Transcript needed: n. (MMD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:34 PM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • (#19) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/26/2019. appellee brief now due 10/25/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Certificate of Service:08/05/2019. [19-5763] (SPI) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ***LOCKED***CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Certificate of Service:08/05/2019. [19-5763] (form is blank, counsel instructed to refile, this form will be locked)--[Edited 08/05/2019 by MMD] (SPI) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ***LOCKED***CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Certificate of Service:08/05/2019. [19-5763] (counsel is directed to file instruction on form and submit directly to mediation office, not to be filed on docket, this form will be locked)--[Edited 08/05/2019 by MMD] (SPI) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ***LOCKEDC***CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Certificate of Service:08/02/2019. [19-5763] (form is blank, counsel instructed to refile, this form will be locked)--[Edited 08/05/2019 by MMD] (SPI) [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/12/2019. appellee brief now due 10/11/2019. (MLB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) The Mediation Conference has been rescheduled as an In-person Conference on 08/29/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller Certificate of Service: 08/02/2019. [19-5763] (SPI) [Entered: 08/02/2019 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***(LOCKED***CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen P. Imhoff for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Certificate of Service:08/02/2019. [19-5763] (form is blank and needs to be saved to pdf before filing on the docket; counsel instructed to file; this form will be locked)--[Edited 08/05/2019 by MMD] (SPI) [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller by Stephen P. Imhoff. Certificate of Service: 07/31/2019. [19-5763] (SPI) [Entered: 07/31/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Kirk Hoskins for Appellee Donna Ruth Bruenger Certificate of Service: 07/20/2019. [19-5763] (KH) [Entered: 07/20/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Donna Ruth Bruenger by Kirk Hoskins. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2019. [19-5763] (KH) [Entered: 07/20/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO FILE APPEARANCE FORM AND CORP. DISCLOSURE AS SEPARATE ENTRIES***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Donna Ruth Bruenger by Kirk Hoskins. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-5763]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CAM] (KH) [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/26/2019;. appellee brief due 09/24/2019; (MMD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle Davis (MMD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Courtenay Ann Miller. Transcript needed: n. (MMD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.