This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/28/2022 at 12:50:29 (UTC).

County of Maui v. Chevron USA Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 County of Maui filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Chevron USA Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15318

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants and Defendants

DOES, 1 through 100 inclusive

BP AMERICA, INC.

CHEVRON USA INC.

ALOHA PETROLEUM LLC

CONOCOPHILLIPS

BHP HAWAII INC.

SUNOCO LP

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

BHP GROUP PLC

BHP GROUP LIMITED

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

PHILLIPS 66

MARATHON PETROLEUM CORP.

SHELL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY LLC

CHEVRON CORPORATION

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

BP PLC

ALOHA PETROLEUM, LTD.

SHELL OIL COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

COUNTY OF MAUI

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John D. Lombardo

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP

777 S Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Lisa Bail

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel, LLP

999 Bishop Street, First Hawaiian Center, Suite 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Ross Tatsuo Shinyama Esquire

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop Street, Suite 1250

Honolulu, HI 96813

Melvyn Ming Miyagi Esquire

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop Street, Suite 1250

Honolulu, HI 96813

Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Jacob Scott Janoe

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Adrian Lyle Lavarias Esquire

Attorney at Bays Lung Rose & Holma

700 Bishop Street, Suite 900

Honolulu, HI 96813

Crystal Rose

Attorney at Bays Lung Rose & Holma

700 Bishop Street, Suite 900

Honolulu, HI 96813

Sean C. Grimsley

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Margery S. Bronster Esquire

Attorney at Bronster Fujichaku Robbins

1003 Bishop Street, Suite 2300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Boaz S. Morag Esquire

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Theodore V. Wells Jr.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Deborah K. Wright Esquire

Attorney at Wright & Kirschbraun LLLC

1885 Main Street, Suite 108

Wailuku, HI 96793

Margaret Tough

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Steven M. Bauer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Shannon S. Broome Esquire

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ann Marie Mortimer

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth, LLP

550 S Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brendan Jeremiah Crimmins

1615 M Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Randall C. Whattoff Esquire

Attorney at Cox Fricke LLP

800 Bethel Street, Suite 600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Richelle M. Thomson Esquire

Attorney at County of Maui

200 South High Street

Wailuku, HI 96793

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#36

No Description Available

#35

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

33 #2

Additional Document

33 #1

Main Document

#115

(#115) Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, RYAN D. NELSON and DANIELLE J. FORREST): The submission of this case is vacated, and further proceedings are held in abeyance pending the issuance of the mandate in County of San Mateo v. Chevron Corp., No. 18-15499. [12375967] [21-15313, 21-15318] (AF) [Entered: 02/22/2022 10:06 AM]

#114

(#114) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [12374800] [21-15313, 21-15318] (KAD) [Entered: 02/18/2022 12:59 PM]

#112

(#112) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/14/2022. [12369045] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:57 AM]

111 #2

Additional Document

111 #1

Main Document

#109

(#109) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/02/2022. [12358261] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:09 AM]

#108

(#108) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/02/2022. [12358258] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:08 AM]

#107

(#107) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12351352] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/25/2022 08:09 PM]

#106

(#106) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12351351] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/25/2022 08:08 PM]

105 #2

Exh. A

77 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, RYAN D. NELSON and DANIELLE J. FORREST): The submission of this case is vacated, and further proceedings are held in abeyance pending the issuance of the mandate in County of San Mateo v. Chevron Corp., No. 18-15499. [12375967] [21-15313, 21-15318] (AF) [Entered: 02/22/2022 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [12374800] [21-15313, 21-15318] (KAD) [Entered: 02/18/2022 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#113) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, RYAN D. NELSON and DANIELLE J. FORREST. [12373557] [21-15313, 21-15318] (KAD) [Entered: 02/17/2022 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/14/2022. [12369045] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Filed (ECF) Appellee City & County of Honolulu in 21-15313, Appellee County of Maui in 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/09/2022. [12365559] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Sher, Victor) [Entered: 02/09/2022 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#110) Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, February 17, 2022 - 09:00 A.M. - Hawaii Bkcy Courtroom 250L - Scheduled Location: Honolulu HI. The hearing time is the local time zone at the scheduled hearing location. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . NOTE: Although your case is currently scheduled for oral argument, the panel may decide to submit the case on the briefs instead. See Fed. R. App. P. 34. Absent further order of the court, if the court does determine that oral argument is required in this case, you may have the option to appear in person at the Courthouse or remotely by video. Check # here for updates on the status of reopening as the hearing date approaches. At this time, even when in person hearings resume, an election to appear remotely by video will not require a motion, and any attorney wishing to appear in person must provide proof of vaccination . The court expects and supports the fact that some attorneys and some judges will continue to appear remotely. If the panel determines that it will hold oral argument in your case, the Clerk's Office will contact you directly at least two weeks before the set argument date to review any requirements for in person appearance or to make any necessary arrangements for remote appearance. Please note however that if you do elect to appear remotely, the court strongly prefers video over telephone appearance. Therefore, if you wish to appear remotely by telephone you will need to file a motion requesting permission to do so. Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to be available (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 28 days before Thursday, February 17, 2022. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[12358802]. [21-15313, 21-15318] (KS) [Entered: 02/02/2022 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/02/2022. [12358261] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/02/2022. [12358258] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12351352] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/25/2022 08:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. in 21-15313, 21-15318 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12351351] [21-15313, 21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/25/2022 08:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Keola R. Whittaker (Department of the Corporation Counsel, County of Maui, 200 South High Street, Wailuku, Hawaii 96793) for Appellee County of Maui. Date of service: 03/04/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12024594] [21-15318] (Whittaker, Keola) [Entered: 03/04/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Daniel Severson for party(s) Appellant Shell Oil Company Appellant Shell Oil Products Company LLC Appellant Royal Dutch Shell PLC, in case 21-15318. [12023802] (DJV) [Entered: 03/04/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel S. Severson (Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C., 1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC 20036) for Appellants Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company and Shell Oil Products Company LLC. Date of service: 03/04/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12023733] [21-15318] (Severson, Daniel) [Entered: 03/04/2021 06:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) David Alan Morris for party(s) Appellant Phillips 66 Appellant ConocoPhillips, in case 21-15318. [12022992] (DJV) [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Alan Morris (Bays Lung Rose & Voss Topa Financial Center 700 Bishop Street, Suite 900 Honolulu, Hawaii 96813) for Appellants ConocoPhillips and Phillips 66. Date of service: 03/03/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12022942] [21-15318] (Morris, David) [Entered: 03/03/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/02/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12022231]. [21-15318] (AD) [Entered: 03/02/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/02/2021. [12022138] [21-15318] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Terminated Brendan Jeremiah Crimmins for Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Company and Royal Dutch Shell PLC in 21-15318 [12021488] (RR) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Brendan Jeremiah Crimmins for Appellants Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company and Shell Oil Products Company LLC. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 03/02/2021. [12021163] [21-15318] (Crimmins, Brendan) [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc., BP America, Inc., BP plc, Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc., ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Does, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corp., Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC and Sunoco LP Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/02/2021. Appellants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc., BP America, Inc., BP plc, Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc., ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Does, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corp., Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC and Sunoco LP opening brief due 04/19/2021. Appellee County of Maui answering brief due 05/19/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12013762] (JBS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacifica Resources, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNOCO LLC is a litigant