This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/13/2022 at 06:17:06 (UTC).

County of Cook v. Bank of America Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 County of Cook filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1407

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS

Defendant / Appellees

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION

COUNTRYWIDE BANK FSB

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kenneth A. Wexler Esq.

Attorney at WEXLER BOLEY & ELGERSMA LLP

55 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew S. Sheldon

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

1900 N Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Thomas M. Hefferon

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

1900 N Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Cook County, Illinois. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7224169] [22-1407] (Wexler, Kenneth) [Entered: 03/21/2022 03:22 PM]

#3

(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, April 5, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7224687] [22-1407] (MM) [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:17 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/05/2022 for Cook County, Illinois. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/06/2022 for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/27/2022 for Appellant Cook County, Illinois. RJS [7224689] [22-1407] (MM) [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:23 AM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas M. Hefferon for Appellees Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated and Countrywide Bank FSB. for BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC; Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.; Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital Inc.; and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.. [5] [7224853] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1407]--[Edited 03/23/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:43 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew S. Sheldon for Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. for BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC; Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.; Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital Inc.; and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.. [6] [7224855] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1407] (Sheldon, Matthew) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:50 PM]

#7

(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew Kim for Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. for BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC; Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.; Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital Inc.; and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.. [7] [7224861] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1407] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:58 PM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler for Appellant Cook County, Illinois. [8] [7225588] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1407] (Wexler, Kenneth) [Entered: 03/28/2022 12:26 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/15/2022 for Cook County, Illinois. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/02/2022 for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/30/2022 for Appellant Cook County, Illinois. RJS [7231751] [22-1407] (AD) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:34 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/15/2022 for Cook County, Illinois. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/02/2022 for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/30/2022 for Appellant Cook County, Illinois. RJS [7231751] [22-1407] (AD) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler for Appellant Cook County, Illinois. [8] [7225588] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1407] (Wexler, Kenneth) [Entered: 03/28/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew Kim for Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. for BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC; Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.; Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital Inc.; and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.. [7] [7224861] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1407] (Kim, Andrew) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew S. Sheldon for Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. for BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC; Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.; Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital Inc.; and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.. [6] [7224855] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1407] (Sheldon, Matthew) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas M. Hefferon for Appellees Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated and Countrywide Bank FSB. for BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; Countrywide Warehouse Lending, LLC; Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.; Merrill Lynch Mortgage Capital Inc.; and Merrill Lynch Mortgage Lending, Inc.. [5] [7224853] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1407]--[Edited 03/23/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/05/2022 for Cook County, Illinois. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/06/2022 for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Bank FSB, Countrywide Financial Corporation and Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/27/2022 for Appellant Cook County, Illinois. RJS [7224689] [22-1407] (MM) [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, April 5, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7224687] [22-1407] (MM) [Entered: 03/23/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Cook County, Illinois. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7224169] [22-1407] (Wexler, Kenneth) [Entered: 03/21/2022 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Cook County, Illinois by 03/21/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 03/28/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/25/2022 for Cook County, Illinois [1] [7223013] [22-1407] (AG) [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cook County, Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant