This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/22/2020 at 06:01:22 (UTC).

County of Butler, et al v. Governor of Pennsylvania, et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 County of Butler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Governor of Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2936

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

Plaintiff / Appellee

COUNTY OF BUTLER

Amicus Curiae

PENNSYLVANIA CHAIR OF THE HOUSE POLICY COMMITTEE

SPEAKER OF THE PENNSYLVANIA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

PENNSYLVANIA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES MAJORITY WHIP

PENNSYLVANIA CHAIR OF THE HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE

PENNSYLVANIA CHAIR OF THE HOUSE MAJORITY CAUCUS

MAJORITY LEADER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

PENNSYLVANIA SECRETARY OF THE HOUSE MAJORITY CAUCUS

EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION & LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

PENNSYLVANIA ADMINISTRATOR OF THE HOUSE MAJORITY CAUCUS

Intervenor

JEFFREY CUTLER

York, PA 17405

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

J. Bart DeLone Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Karen M. Romano Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Daniel B. Mullen Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sean A. Kirkpatrick Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas E. Breth Esq.

Attorney at Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham

128 West Cunningham Street

Butler, PA 16001

Thomas W. King Esq. III

Attorney at Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham

128 West Cunningham Street

Butler, PA 16001

Jordan P. Shuber Esq.

Attorney at Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham

128 West Cunningham Street

Butler, PA 16001

Ronald T. Elliott Esq.

Attorney at Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham

128 West Cunningham Street

Butler, PA 16001

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Anthony R. Holtzman Esq.

Attorney at K&L Gates

17 North Second Street, 18Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Lawrence J. Joseph Esq.

1250 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Intervenor Attorney

Jeffrey Cutler

P.O. Box 2806

York, PA 17405

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#5

#4

#3

1 #6

DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ORDER

1 #5

FINAL DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

1 #4

MEMORANDUM ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket(#43) COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Addendum to brief with missing certifications received from Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. (MS) [Entered: 11/19/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health containing Corrected Certificate of Counsel. Certificate of Service dated 11/19/2020 by ECF. [20-2936]--[Edited 11/19/2020 by MS] (JBD) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney J. Bart DeLone, Esq. for Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health to file Addendum to Brief with certification of identical brief compliance. Addendum must be filed in electronic format only. Due on or before 11/23/2020. (MS) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2020 by ECF. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2020 by ECF. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2020 by ECF. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2020 by ECF. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2020 by ECF. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health to accept Appellants' Opening Brief that is in excess of word count. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER (JORDAN, KRAUSE and PHIPPS, Circuit Judges) denying Document from Proposed Intervenor Jeffrey Cutler Titled Petition for En Banc Review of Petition to Combine Cases, treated as a Motion to Reconsider the Courts 10/9/20 Order Denying Intervention, with Request for Referral to the Court En Banc pursuant to 3d Cir. I.O.P. 10.3.3.. Panel No.: DCO-008. Jordan, Authoring Judge. (LMR) [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of See attached Exhibit A.. on behalf of Appellee County of Butler. [20-2936] (TWK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ronald T. Elliott, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) County of Butler, et al. [20-2936] (RTE) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas E. Breth, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) County of Butler, et al. [20-2936] (TEB) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of Appellee(s) County of Butler, et al. [20-2936] (JPS) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas W. King, III on behalf of Appellee(s) County of Butler, et al. [20-2936] (TWK) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mr. John Bart DeLone on behalf of Appellant(s) Governor of Pennsylvania; Pennsylvania Secretary of Health. [20-2936] (JBD) [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellant(s) Governor of Pennsylvania; Pennsylvania Secretary of Health. [20-2936] (DBM) [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Thomas W. King, Esq. the designated filer shall be County of Butler. (LMR) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of State in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00677. (LMR) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives is a litigant

Latest cases where GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases where EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION & LEGAL DEFENSE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant