This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 06:05:41 (UTC).

Council of Parent Attorneys a v. Betsy DeVos, et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Council of Parent Attorneys a filed an Other lawsuit against Betsy DeVos. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5137

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

Johnny W. Collet, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Special Education and Rehabilitative Services

United States Department of Education

Betsy DeVos, in her official capacity as Secretary of Education

Plaintiff / Appellee

Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Jeffrey Eric Sandberg

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Marleigh D. Dover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Seth Galanter

Attorney at National Center for Youth Law

1313 L Street, Nw, Suite 130

Washington, DC 20005

Jennifer Jo Clark

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jean-Claude Andre

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791977] filed by Seth M. Galanter and co-counsel Crystal M. Adams on behalf of Appellee Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. [19-5137] (Galanter, Seth) [Entered: 06/10/2019 06:14 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791945] filed by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Clark, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791944] filed by Jennifer J. Clark and co-counsel Jean-Claude Andre on behalf of Appellee Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. [19-5137] (Andre, Jean-Claude) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:40 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791942] filed by Jennifer J. Clark on behalf of Appellee Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. [19-5137] (Clark, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:37 PM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1791906] submitted by Betsy DeVos, EDUC and Johnny W. Collet [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1791905] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1791903] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1791902] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:08 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1791901] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:07 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791900] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:05 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791232] filed by Jeffrey E. Sandberg and co-counsel Marleigh Dover on behalf of Appellants Betsy DeVos, EDUC and Johnny W. Collet. [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:21 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1787444] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-5137] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:31 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787441] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01636-TSC filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5137. [19-5137] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:23 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791977] filed by Seth M. Galanter and co-counsel Crystal M. Adams on behalf of Appellee Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. [19-5137] (Galanter, Seth) [Entered: 06/10/2019 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791945] filed by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Clark, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791944] filed by Jennifer J. Clark and co-counsel Jean-Claude Andre on behalf of Appellee Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. [19-5137] (Andre, Jean-Claude) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791942] filed by Jennifer J. Clark on behalf of Appellee Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. [19-5137] (Clark, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1791906] submitted by Betsy DeVos, EDUC and Johnny W. Collet [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1791905] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1791903] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1791902] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1791901] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791900] filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791232] filed by Jeffrey E. Sandberg and co-counsel Marleigh Dover on behalf of Appellants Betsy DeVos, EDUC and Johnny W. Collet. [19-5137] (Sandberg, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1787444] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-5137] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787441] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01636-TSC filed by Johnny W. Collet, Betsy DeVos and EDUC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5137. [19-5137] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5137] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.