Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 06:23:47 (UTC).

CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. v. Duo Security LLC

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 CosmoKey Solutions GmbH Co filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Duo Security LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2043

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DUO SECURITY, INC.

DUO SECURITY LLC, fka Duo Security, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

COSMOKEY SOLUTIONS GMBH & CO. KG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Bethany Bengfort

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark A. Lemley

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David E. Moore Esq.

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N Market Street, Hercules Plaza, 6Th Floor, Po Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899

Stefan Mentzer

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Scott Thomas Weingaertner

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION of Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG to extend the time to 10/06/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/10/2020 by email. [720694] [20-2043] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:13 PM]

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG, Motion of Appellant to extend the time to file brief [ # 13 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 09/16/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [720425] [EKD] [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:31 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION of Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG to extend the time to 10/06/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/08/2020 by email. [720237] [20-2043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 14 ] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 09/08/2020 06:04 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER The motion is granted. The revised official caption and short caption are reflected in this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [715646] [NL] [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:22 PM]

#11

(#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley; Bethany D. Bengfort as counsel for Appellee Duo Security, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2020 by email. [714821] [20-2043] [Bethany Bengfort] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:08 PM]

#10

(#10) Letter from Appellee Duo Security, Inc. apprising the Court of a correction in the Official Caption. Service: 08/11/2020 by email. [714205] [20-2043] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:04 PM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Duo Security, Inc.. Service: 08/11/2020 by email. [714166] [20-2043] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:26 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Duo Security, Inc., Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 08/17/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [713634] [EKD] [Entered: 08/10/2020 10:53 AM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713468] [20-2043] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 08/07/2020 04:32 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713464] [20-2043] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 08/07/2020 04:27 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Scott T. Weingaertner and Stefan Mentzer as counsel for Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713456] [20-2043]--[Edited 08/07/2020 by EKD to revise docket text] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 08/07/2020 04:12 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Duo Security, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713347] [20-2043] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:30 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Duo Security, Inc. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713344] [20-2043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:29 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley; Bethany D. Bengfort as counsel for Appellee Duo Security, Inc. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713343] [20-2043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:28 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 15 ] filed by Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. The opening brief is due 10/06/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [720709] [EKD] [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION of Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG to extend the time to 10/06/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/10/2020 by email. [720694] [20-2043] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG, Motion of Appellant to extend the time to file brief [ # 13 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 09/16/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [720425] [EKD] [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG to extend the time to 10/06/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/08/2020 by email. [720237] [20-2043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 14 ] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 09/08/2020 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER The motion is granted. The revised official caption and short caption are reflected in this order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [715646] [NL] [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley; Bethany D. Bengfort as counsel for Appellee Duo Security, Inc.. Service: 08/13/2020 by email. [714821] [20-2043] [Bethany Bengfort] [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Appellee Duo Security, Inc. apprising the Court of a correction in the Official Caption. Service: 08/11/2020 by email. [714205] [20-2043] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Duo Security, Inc.. Service: 08/11/2020 by email. [714166] [20-2043] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Duo Security, Inc., Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 08/17/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [713634] [EKD] [Entered: 08/10/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713468] [20-2043] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 08/07/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713464] [20-2043] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 08/07/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Scott T. Weingaertner and Stefan Mentzer as counsel for Appellant CosmoKey Solutions GmbH & Co. KG. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713456] [20-2043]--[Edited 08/07/2020 by EKD to revise docket text] [Scott Weingaertner] [Entered: 08/07/2020 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Duo Security, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713347] [20-2043] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Duo Security, Inc. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713344] [20-2043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Mark A. Lemley; Bethany D. Bengfort as counsel for Appellee Duo Security, Inc. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713343] [20-2043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Mark Lemley] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/23/2020. [710023] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/07/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/07/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 08/07/2020. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due on 09/22/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ellis Moore