This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 06:11:49 (UTC).

Corry Sorrell v. Paige Industrial Services, Inc

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Corry Sorrell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Paige Industrial Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-7062

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Paige Industrial Services, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Corry D. Sorrell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen M. Silvestri

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

2800 Quarry Lake Drive, Suite 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

Charles Joseph Kresslein Esquire

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

2800 Quarry Lake Drive, Suite 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kenneth E. McPherson Esquire

Attorney at Kenneth E. McPherson, Chtd

Po Box 475

Fulton, MD 20759

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

STATEMENT [1906619] with Disclosure Listing filed by Paige Industrial Services, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2021 ] [21-7062] (Silvestri, Stephen) [Entered: 07/15/2021 04:46 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1906436] filed by Paige Industrial Services, Inc. [Service Date: 07/14/2021 ] [21-7062] (Silvestri, Stephen) [Entered: 07/14/2021 04:53 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC DC Memorandum Opinion

Open Document #2

USDC DC Order of May 27, 2021

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1906169] filed by Stephen M. Silvestri and co-counsel Charles J. Kresslein on behalf of Appellee Paige Industrial Services, Inc.. [21-7062] (Silvestri, Stephen) [Entered: 07/13/2021 01:09 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1906066] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/13/2021 ] [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/13/2021 12:40 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1905813] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/10/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:17 PM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service for Docketing Statement

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement Filed

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1905811] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/10/2021 ] [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:04 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1905810] filed by Kenneth E. McPherson on behalf of Appellant Corry D. Sorrell. [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:00 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1902069] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-02004-TJK filed by Corry D. Sorrell. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7062. [21-7062] [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:47 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1908970] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/13/2021. APPENDIX due 09/13/2021. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/13/2021. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/03/2021 [21-7062] [Entered: 08/04/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1906619] with Disclosure Listing filed by Paige Industrial Services, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2021 ] [21-7062] (Silvestri, Stephen) [Entered: 07/15/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1906436] filed by Paige Industrial Services, Inc. [Service Date: 07/14/2021 ] [21-7062] (Silvestri, Stephen) [Entered: 07/14/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1906249] submitted by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/13/2021 ] [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/13/2021 08:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1906169] filed by Stephen M. Silvestri and co-counsel Charles J. Kresslein on behalf of Appellee Paige Industrial Services, Inc.. [21-7062] (Silvestri, Stephen) [Entered: 07/13/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1906066] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/13/2021 ] [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/13/2021 12:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1905813] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/10/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1905812] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/10/2021 ] [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1905811] filed by Corry D. Sorrell [Service Date: 07/10/2021 ] [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1905810] filed by Kenneth E. McPherson on behalf of Appellant Corry D. Sorrell. [21-7062] (McPherson, Kenneth) [Entered: 07/10/2021 09:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1902078] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/12/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/26/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/12/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/12/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/12/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/26/2021 [21-7062] [Entered: 06/11/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1902069] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-02004-TJK filed by Corry D. Sorrell. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7062. [21-7062] [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7062] [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth E. McPherson(Designation Retained)