This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2019 at 06:06:40 (UTC).

Cornell McKay v. City of St. Louis, et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Cornell McKay filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of St Louis. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1912

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

SC Ryan Consulting, LLC

Jennifer Joyce

Susan Ryan

Defendant / Appellees

Thomas Irwin

City of St. Louis

David Rudolf, in his individual and official capacities

Erwin O. Switzer, in their official capacities as members of the St. Louis City Board of Police Commissioners

Richard Gray

Anthony Boettigheimer, in his individual and official capacities

Francis G. Slay, in his official capacity as an ex-officio member of the St. Louis City Board of Police Commissioners

Bettye Battle-Turner

Joseph Spence, in his individual capacity

Christian Stamper, in his individual and official capacities

Plaintiff / Appellant

Cornell McKay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew D. Kinghorn

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Old Post Office Building, P.O. Box 861

Saint Louis, MO 63188

Henry F. Luepke III

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Old Post Office Building, P.O. Box 861

Saint Louis, MO 63188

Robert J. Isaacson

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Old Post Office Building, P.O. Box 861

Saint Louis, MO 63188

Laura M. Robb

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 200, 815 Olive Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

J. Brent Dulle

Attorney at CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE

314 City Hall, 1200 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63103-0000

Deborah Bell Yates

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Old Post Office Building, P.O. Box 861

Saint Louis, MO 63188

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James R. Dowd

Attorney at ONDERLAW, LLC

2Nd Floor, 110 E. Lockwood

Saint Louis, MO 63119

Brandy B. Barth

Attorney at NEWTON & BARTH

Suite 420, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

James R. Dowd Jr.

Attorney at ONDER LAW, LLC

2Nd Floor, 110 E. Lockwood

Saint Louis, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4797083-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Andrew D. Kinghorn for Appellees Mr. Francis G. Slay, Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Mr. Christian Stamper and David Rudolf. Mr. Andrew D. Kinghorn has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [4797291] [19-1912] (YML) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:13 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Appellees Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, David Rudolf, Mr. Francis G. Slay, Mr. Christian Stamper and Erwin O. Switzer w/service 06/12/2019. [4797083] [19-1912] (ADK) [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Laura M. Robb for Appellees Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Mr. Christian Stamper, David Rudolf, Richard Gray, Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Erwin O. Switzer, Mr. Francis G. Slay and Thomas Irwin w/service 06/12/2019 [4796978] [19-1912] (LMR) [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:31 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4791524-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay [4791571] Brief of Cornell McKay due 07/12/2019. Appendix due on 07/12/2019. [4791571] [19-1912] (CMD) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Compliance

Open Document #1

Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Appellant's Brief

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay - w/service 05/17/2019. [4788772] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:32 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay - Joint Appendix - w/service 05/17/2019 [4788752] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:14 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay. No Transcript Will be Ordered [4788746] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James R. Dowd for Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay w/service 05/16/2019 [4788260] [19-1912] (JRD) [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Andrew D. Kinghorn for Appellees Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Mr. Christian Stamper, David Rudolf, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Erwin O. Switzer and Mr. Francis G. Slay w/service 05/09/2019 [4785905] [19-1912] (ADK) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Deborah Bell Yates for Appellee Mr. Joseph Spence w/service 05/09/2019 [4785876] [19-1912] (DBY) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by J. Brent Dulle for Appellee City of St. Louis w/service 05/07/2019 [4785332] [19-1912] (JD) [Entered: 05/07/2019 05:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brandy Barth for Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay w/service 05/07/2019 [4785186] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:41 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/12/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Cornell McKay due 06/12/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4784158] [19-1912] (RLS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:14 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum and order dated 03/31/2019, judgment dated 03/31/2019. [4784153] [19-1912] (RLS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4784123] [19-1912] (RLS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:39 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4797083-2 ] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Andrew D. Kinghorn for Appellees Mr. Francis G. Slay, Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin O. Switzer, Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Mr. Christian Stamper and David Rudolf. Mr. Andrew D. Kinghorn has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [4797291] [19-1912] (YML) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Appellees Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, David Rudolf, Mr. Francis G. Slay, Mr. Christian Stamper and Erwin O. Switzer w/service 06/12/2019. [4797083] [19-1912] (ADK) [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Laura M. Robb for Appellees Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Mr. Christian Stamper, David Rudolf, Richard Gray, Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Erwin O. Switzer, Mr. Francis G. Slay and Thomas Irwin w/service 06/12/2019 [4796978] [19-1912] (LMR) [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4791524-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay [4791571] Brief of Cornell McKay due 07/12/2019. Appendix due on 07/12/2019. [4791571] [19-1912] (CMD) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 07/17/2019, filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay w/service 05/28/2019. [4791524] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay - w/service 05/17/2019. [4788772] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay - Joint Appendix - w/service 05/17/2019 [4788752] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay. No Transcript Will be Ordered [4788746] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by James R. Dowd for Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay w/service 05/16/2019 [4788260] [19-1912] (JRD) [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Andrew D. Kinghorn for Appellees Mr. Anthony Boettigheimer, Mr. Christian Stamper, David Rudolf, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Ms. Bettye Battle-Turner, Erwin O. Switzer and Mr. Francis G. Slay w/service 05/09/2019 [4785905] [19-1912] (ADK) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Deborah Bell Yates for Appellee Mr. Joseph Spence w/service 05/09/2019 [4785876] [19-1912] (DBY) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by J. Brent Dulle for Appellee City of St. Louis w/service 05/07/2019 [4785332] [19-1912] (JD) [Entered: 05/07/2019 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Brandy Barth for Appellant Mr. Cornell McKay w/service 05/07/2019 [4785186] [19-1912] (BBB) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/12/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Cornell McKay due 06/12/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4784158] [19-1912] (RLS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum and order dated 03/31/2019, judgment dated 03/31/2019. [4784153] [19-1912] (RLS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4784123] [19-1912] (RLS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less