This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:31 (UTC).

Corbett v. City of New York

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Corbett filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2152

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

City of New York

Thomas M. Prasso

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jonathan Corbett

Hollywood, CA 90029

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Zachary W. Carter

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Elina Druker

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jonathan Corbett Esq.

Attorney at Jonathan Corbett, Esq.

958 North Western Avenue

Hollywood, CA 90029

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jonathan Corbett Brief due date as 10/15/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 10/15/2019, FILED.[2624736] [19-2152] [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:47 AM]

#21

(#21) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2624730] [19-2152] [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:44 AM]

#18

(#18) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, informing Court of proposed due date 10/15/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623644] [19-2152] [Entered: 08/03/2019 09:49 PM]

#13

(#13) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619691] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:18 PM]

12 #5

Addendum A-4 (District Court Dismissal Order)

12 #6

Addendum A-4 (District Court Order Denying Reconsideration)

12 #1

Form C FILED

12 #2

Addenda A-1, A-2, & B (Pre-Argument Statement, Result Below, Issues Raised, Appe

12 #3

Addendum A-3 (Amended Notice of Appeal)

12 #4

Addendum A-3 (District Court Docket)

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619687] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:01 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Thomas M. Prasso and City of New York, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by US mail. [2613949] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:00 PM]

8 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

8 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#7

(#7) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/18/2019, RECEIVED.[2612527] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:10 AM]

#6

(#6) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED.[2612525] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:09 AM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jonathan Corbett Brief due date as 10/15/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 10/15/2019, FILED.[2624736] [19-2152] [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2624730] [19-2152] [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, informing Court of proposed due date 10/15/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623644] [19-2152] [Entered: 08/03/2019 09:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#14) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, district court receipt # 465401240887, FILED.[2620550] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619691] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619689] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619687] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY, Elina Druker, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Zachary W. Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2614012] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Thomas M. Prasso and City of New York, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by US mail. [2613949] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2612529] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/18/2019, RECEIVED.[2612527] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED.[2612525] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#5) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Jonathan Corbett, Esq. for Appellant Jonathan Corbett, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2610596] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610585] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/17/2019, RECEIVED.[2610582] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/17/2019, RECEIVED.[2610581] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jonathan Corbett, FILED. [2610579] [19-2152] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.