This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2021 at 06:14:44 (UTC).

Cooperative Entertainment, Inc. v. Kollective Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Cooperative Entertainment, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kollective Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2167

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

COOPERATIVE ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

KOLLECTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Todd Christopher Atkins

2261 Rutherford Road

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Meredith Martin Addy

Attorney at AddyHart P.C.

10 Glenlake Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30328

Matthew Michael Wawrzyn

Attorney at Wawrzyn LLC

200 East Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael S. Dowler

Attorney at Park, Vaughan, Fleming & Dowler LLP

5847 San Felipe

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Cooperative Entertainment, Inc. The opening brief is due 11/05/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [798880] [JCW] [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION of Appellant Cooperative Entertainment, Inc. to extend the time to 11/05/2021 to file brief. Service: 09/13/2021 by email. [798823] [21-2167] [Matthew Wawrzyn] [Entered: 09/13/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Cooperative Entertainment, Inc.. Service: 08/05/2021 by email. [790842] [21-2167] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 08/05/2021 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Cooperative Entertainment, Inc.. Service: 08/05/2021 by email. [790840] [21-2167] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 08/05/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Matthew Michael Wawrzyn as counsel for Appellant Cooperative Entertainment, Inc.. Service: 08/05/2021 by email. [790758] [21-2167] [Matthew Wawrzyn] [Entered: 08/05/2021 01:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Meredith Martin Addy as counsel for Appellant Cooperative Entertainment, Inc.. Service: 08/04/2021 by email. [790527] [21-2167] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 08/04/2021 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Kollective Technology, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2021 by email. [788583] [21-2167] [Michael Dowler] [Entered: 07/26/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Kollective Technology, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2021 by email. [788581] [21-2167] [Michael Dowler] [Entered: 07/26/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Michael S. Dowler as counsel for Appellee Kollective Technology, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2021 by email. [788578] [21-2167] [Michael Dowler] [Entered: 07/26/2021 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/23/2021. [788416] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/06/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/06/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 08/06/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 09/21/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 07/23/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cooperative Entertainment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Scott Dowler