This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/16/2019 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

Cooper, et al v. Reichert, et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Cooper filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Reichert. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-8013

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

KELLY COOPER

MICHELLE COOPER, as representative and as next friends of Jason Cooper

Defendant / Appellees

FRANK REICHERT

BOSS TRUCK SHOPS INC., a Nebraska corporation

RANDY HAINES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Fred H. Shepherd

Attorney at Vickery & Shepherd

10000 Memorial Drive, Suite 750

Houston, TX 77024-3485

Jack D. Edwards

Attorney at Edwards Law Office

P.O. Box 5345

Etna, WY 83118

Earl Landers Vickery

Attorney at Law Office of Earl Landers Vickery

3007 Dancy

Austin, TX 78722

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard A. Waltz

Attorney at Waltz Reeves

1660 Lincoln Street, Suite 2510

Denver, CO 80264-0000

Christopher R. Reeves

Attorney at Waltz Reeves

1660 Lincoln Street, Suite 2510

Denver, CO 80264-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Judgment in Favor of Defendants

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10636679] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 04/30/2019 for Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. [19-8013] [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631614] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/07/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 04/16/2019 for Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. [19-8013] [Entered: 03/07/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631472] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-8013] [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631314] Docketing statement filed by Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8013] ELV [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • [10631231] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 03/13/2019 for Stephan Harris, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-8013] [Entered: 03/06/2019 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631214] Notice of deficient docketing statement received from Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. Type of deficiency: No proof of service. Docketing statement due 03/18/2019 for Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. [19-8013] [Entered: 03/06/2019 07:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631197] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. Transcript ordered: None.. Served on: 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8013] ELV [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket. [LG] This was cited as deficient, and a corrected one was filed on 3/6/19. [10631196] Docketing statement filed by Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8013] ELV [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631194] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Earl Landers Vickery for Michelle Cooper and Kelly Cooper. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-8013] [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • [10631148] Entry of appearance submitted by Earl Landers Vickery for Appellants Kelly Cooper and Michelle CooperJason Cooper for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8013] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 03/05/2019 by NA] ELV [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10630999] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: failure to file. Docketing statement, entry of appearance, and transcript order form due 03/15/2019 for Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. [19-8013] [Entered: 03/05/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10630444] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher R. Reeves and Mr. Richard A. Waltz for Frank Reichert, Randy Haines and Boss Truck Shops Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-8013] [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • [10630423] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher Robert Reeves and Richard Alan Waltz for Appellees Boss Truck Shops Inc., Randy Haines and Frank Reichert for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/01/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-8013] CRR [Entered: 03/01/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10627317] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/15/2019. Docketing statement due 03/01/2019 for Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. Transcript order form due 03/01/2019 for Kelly Cooper and Michelle Cooper. Notice of appearance due on 03/01/2019 for Boss Truck Shops Inc, Kelly Cooper, Michelle Cooper, Randy Haines and Frank Reichert [19-8013] [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A. Waltz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R Reeves