This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2022 at 06:10:58 (UTC).

Coon v. Kijakazi

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Coon filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Kijakazi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1008

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Danielle Coon

Defendant / Appellee

Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter A. Gorton Esq.

Attorney at Lachman & Gorton

1500 East Main Street, P.O. Box 89

Endicott, NY 13761

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Luis A. Pere

Attorney at Social Security Administration

25 New Sudbury St., Jfk Federal Bldg.

Boston, MA 21235

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Danielle Coon Brief due date as 08/10/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 08/10/2022, FILED.[3335373] [22-1008] [Entered: 06/21/2022 11:15 AM]

#17

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

10 #7

Supporting Document

10 #6

Supporting Document

10 #5

Supporting Document

10 #4

Supporting Document

10 #3

Supporting Document

10 #2

Supporting Document

10 #1

Form C FILED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Danielle Coon Brief due date as 08/10/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 08/10/2022, FILED.[3335373] [22-1008] [Entered: 06/21/2022 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dennisse Pizarro-Lebron, ASSIGNED.[3331403] [22-1008] [Entered: 06/13/2022 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Danielle Coon, informing Court of proposed due date 08/10/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3313885] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/12/2022 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Danielle Coon, FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3313882] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/12/2022 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Danielle Coon, FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3313880] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/12/2022 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Danielle Coon, FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3313872] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/12/2022 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 05/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3309667] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/05/2022 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3309406] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/05/2022 06:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/17/2022, RECEIVED.[3309405] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/05/2022 06:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/16/2022, RECEIVED.[3309404] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/05/2022 06:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Danielle Coon, FILED. [3309403] [22-1008] [Entered: 05/05/2022 06:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Luis A. Pere