This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2021 at 06:57:37 (UTC).

Continental Resources, Inc. v. Sally Jewell, et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 Continental Resources, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Sally Jewell. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-5333

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

United States Department of the Interior

Sally Jewell, Secretary, United States Department of the Interior

James P. Morris, Supervisory Minerals Revenue Specialist, Western Audit and Compliance Management, Office of Natural Resource Revenue, Western Audit and Compliance

Office of Natural Resources Revenue

Gregory J. Gould, Director, Office of Natural Resources Revenue, United States Department of the Interior

Plaintiff / Appellant

Continental Resources, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Tamara Nichelle Rountree

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lyle Poe Leggette

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Alexander K. Obrecht

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Rosario Clarissa Doriott Dominguez

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [15-5333] [Entered: 03/27/2017 10:24 AM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1667877] filed granting appellant's bill of costs in the amount of $665.21 [ # 1660821-2 ]. [15-5333] [Entered: 03/27/2017 10:12 AM]

Open Document

BILL OF COSTS [1660821] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 02/10/2017 06:29 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1658382] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [15-5333] [Entered: 01/31/2017 10:07 AM]

Open Document

OPINION [1658381] filed (Pages: 7) for the Court by Judge Randolph. [15-5333] [Entered: 01/31/2017 10:06 AM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1658379] filed that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Brown, Srinivasan, and Randolph. [15-5333] [Entered: 01/31/2017 10:03 AM]

Open Document

ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Brown, Srinivasan and Randolph. [15-5333] [Entered: 10/25/2016 10:32 AM]

Open Document

PER CURIAM ORDER [1640915] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant- 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 10/18/2016 [15-5333] [Entered: 10/13/2016 03:29 PM]

Open Document #5

Provisional Certificate as to Parties, Rulings, and Related Cases

Open Document #4

Exhibit C - Final Judgment

Open Document #3

Exhibit B - Order

Open Document #2

Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement Filed

Open Document #2

Attachment - Certificate of No Transcript Order (from District Court)

Open Document #1

Transcript Status Report

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1587387] filed by Lyle Poe Leggette and co-counsel Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez Alexander K. Obrecht on behalf of Appellant Continental Resources, Inc.. [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 12/08/2015 11:39 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1586494] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/19/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/04/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/04/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/04/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/19/2016 [15-5333] [Entered: 12/03/2015 09:33 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1586492] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00065-RDM. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-5333] [Entered: 12/03/2015 09:28 AM]

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [15-5333] [Entered: 03/27/2017 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1667877] filed granting appellant's bill of costs in the amount of $665.21 [ # 1660821-2 ]. [15-5333] [Entered: 03/27/2017 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS [1660821] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 02/10/2017 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1658382] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [15-5333] [Entered: 01/31/2017 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPINION [1658381] filed (Pages: 7) for the Court by Judge Randolph. [15-5333] [Entered: 01/31/2017 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1658379] filed that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Brown, Srinivasan, and Randolph. [15-5333] [Entered: 01/31/2017 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Brown, Srinivasan and Randolph. [15-5333] [Entered: 10/25/2016 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2016
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Tamara N. Rountree, on behalf of Appellees Gregory J. Gould, Sally Jewell, James P. Morris, Office of Natural Resources Revenue and DOI (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-5333] (Rountree, Tamara) [Entered: 10/16/2016 11:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, L. Poe Leggette, on behalf of Appellant Continental Resources, Inc. (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 10/13/2016 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1640915] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant- 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 10/18/2016 [15-5333] [Entered: 10/13/2016 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1592923] filed by Tamara N. Rountree on behalf of Appellees Gregory J. Gould, Sally Jewell, James P. Morris, Office of Natural Resources Revenue and DOI. [15-5333] (Rountree, Tamara) [Entered: 01/11/2016 09:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1598023] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. [Service Date: 12/30/2015 ] [15-5333] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 02/09/2016 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1591315] submitted by Continental Resources, Inc. [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 12/30/2015 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1591314] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. [Service Date: 12/30/2015 ] [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 12/30/2015 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1591311] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. [Service Date: 12/30/2015 ] [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 12/30/2015 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1588250] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. [Service Date: 12/11/2015 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 12/11/2015 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1587387] filed by Lyle Poe Leggette and co-counsel Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez Alexander K. Obrecht on behalf of Appellant Continental Resources, Inc.. [15-5333] (Leggette, Lyle) [Entered: 12/08/2015 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1586494] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/04/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/19/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/04/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/04/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/04/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/19/2016 [15-5333] [Entered: 12/03/2015 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1586492] filed by Continental Resources, Inc. seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00065-RDM. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-5333] [Entered: 12/03/2015 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [15-5333] [Entered: 12/03/2015 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL RESOURCES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Karl Obrecht