This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 06:06:22 (UTC).

Continental Automt Sys, Inc. v. Avanci, L.L.C., et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Continental Automt Sys, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Avanci, L L C . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11032

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Avanci, L.L.C., a Delaware corporation

Optis Cellular Technology, L.L.C., a Delaware corporation

Avanci Platform International Limited, an Irish company

Nokia Corporation, a Finnish corporation

Nokia Technologies Oy, a Finnish corporation

Optis UP Holdings, L.L.C., a Delaware corporation

Nokia of America Corporation, a Delaware corporation

Sharp Corporation, a Japanese corporation

Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, a Finnish corporation

Optis Wireless Technology, L.L.C., a Delaware Corporation

Nokia Solutions and Networks U.S., L.L.C., a Delaware corporation

Conversant Wireless Licensing SARL, a Luxembourg corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated, a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ian Papendick

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Aldo A. Badini

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Patrick S. Opdyke

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Susannah P. Torpey

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Eric S. Tautfest

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, L.L.P.

1601 Elm Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason G. Sheasby

Attorney at Irell & Manella, L.L.P.

1800 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ingrid Marie Haslund Petersen

Attorney at Irell & Manella, L.L.P.

840 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6323

Hong Annita Zhong

Attorney at Irell & Manella, L.L.P.

1800 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Theodore E. Stevenson III

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrew Jacob Tuck

Attorney at Alston & Bird, L.L.P.

1201 W. Peachtree Street, 1 Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309

Christopher Kao

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, L.L.P.

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-2228

Theodore J. Angelis

Attorney at K & L Gates, L.L.P.

925 4Th Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104-1158

James Granger Kress

Attorney at Baker Botts, L.L.P.

700 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer Klein Ayers

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Martin Bader

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, L.L.P.

12275 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Mona Solouki

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-0000

Matthew Holder

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, L.L.P.

12275 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Michael Scarborough

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-0000

Karin Dougan Vogel

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, L.L.P.

501 W. Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated for filing Appellent's Brief until 01/22/2021 [20-11032] (Matthew Holder ) [Entered: 11/24/2020 07:21 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/28/2020 for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated. [20-11032] (MRW) [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:32 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Martin Bader ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Mona Solouki ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:50 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Michael Scarborough ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:46 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Andrew Jacob Tuck ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:49 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9425835-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 11/05/2020 for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:49 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated [20-11032] (CBW) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:44 AM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated. Extension Granted to and including 01/22/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/22/2021 for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated for filing Appellent's Brief until 01/22/2021 [20-11032] (Matthew Holder ) [Entered: 11/24/2020 07:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/28/2020 for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated. [20-11032] (MRW) [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-11032] (MRW) [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Theodore J. Angelis for party(s) Appellee Sharp Corporation, in case 20-11032 [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Ben Bernell is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer working on this case. [20-11032] (CBW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11032] (Theodore J. Angelis ) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer Klein Ayers for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated in 20-11032 [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 11/09/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Benjamin L. Bernell for party(s) Appellee Sharp Corporation, in case 20-11032 [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stephen Sandor Korniczky for party(s) Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated, in case 20-11032 [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Karin Dougan Vogel ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Martin Bader ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Mona Solouki ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Michael Scarborough ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11032] (Matthew Holder ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11032] (Andrew Jacob Tuck ) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jason G. Sheasby for party(s) Appellee Optis Wireless Technology, L.L.C. Appellee Optis Cellular Technology, L.L.C. Appellee Optis UP Holdings, L.L.C., in case 20-11032 [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 10/29/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11032] (Jason G. Sheasby ) [Entered: 10/28/2020 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9425835-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 11/05/2020 for Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated [20-11032] (MFY) [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Continental Automotive Systems, Incorporated [20-11032] (CBW) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nokia of America Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Nokia Corporation is a litigant