This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/14/2022 at 06:02:22 (UTC).

Contant v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Contant filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3058

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bank of America Corporation

Bank of America, N.A.

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.

The Bank of Tokyo Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.

Barclays Bank PLC

Barclays Capital Inc.

BNP Paribas Group

BNP Paribas North America, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellees

James Contant, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Martin-Han Tran, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Carlos Gonzalez, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Ugnius Matkus, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Jerry Jacobson, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Paul Vermillion, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Sandra Lavender

Victor Hernandez

FX Primus Ltd.

Charles G. Hitchcock, III

Tina Porter

Petitioner / Appellant

AMA Capital Management, LLC

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael J. Kane Esq.

Attorney at Berger & Montague, P.C.

1622 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael Dell'Angelo Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Damian Raphael Cavaleri

Attorney at Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

1 Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3258671] [22-159] [Entered: 02/10/2022 09:18 AM]

#55

(#55) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3258333] [22-159] [Entered: 02/09/2022 03:15 PM]

#54

(#54) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3258332] [21-3058, 22-19] [Entered: 02/09/2022 03:14 PM]

#47

(#47) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3250442] [22-19] [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:03 PM]

#44

(#44) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3250375] [22-19] [Entered: 01/26/2022 02:26 PM]

#43

(#43) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3250373] [21-3058] [Entered: 01/26/2022 02:24 PM]

5 #3

Addendum B

5 #2

Addendum A

5 #1

Form C

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3230083] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:04 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3230079] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:03 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket(#59) ATTORNEY, Michael J. Kane for Victor Hernandez, Charles G. Hitchcock, III, James Contant, Jerry Jacobson, Tina Porter, Ugnius Matkus, Martin-Han Tran, FX Primus Ltd., Paul Vermillion, Carlos Gonzalez, Sandra Lavender, in case 22-159, [ # 3259037-2 ], ADDED.[3259083] [22-159] [Entered: 02/10/2022 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3258671] [22-159] [Entered: 02/10/2022 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3258333] [22-159] [Entered: 02/09/2022 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3258332] [21-3058, 22-19] [Entered: 02/09/2022 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3250442] [22-19] [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3250375] [22-19] [Entered: 01/26/2022 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/02/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3250373] [21-3058] [Entered: 01/26/2022 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3250575] [22-159] [Entered: 01/27/2022 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#49) NOTE: See lead case, 21-3058, containing complete set of docket entries.[3250574] [22-159] [Entered: 01/27/2022 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant AMA Capital Management, LLC in 22-159, FILED. [3250569] [22-159, 21-3058] [Entered: 01/27/2022 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee James Contant, FX Primus Ltd., Carlos Gonzalez, Victor Hernandez, Charles G. Hitchcock, III, Jerry Jacobson, Sandra Lavender, Ugnius Matkus, Tina Porter, Martin-Han Tran and Paul Vermillion, FILED. Service date 01/04/2022 by CM/ECF.[3236987] [21-3058] [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE, to Appellees James Contant, FX Primus Ltd., Carlos Gonzalez, Victor Hernandez, Charles G. Hitchcock, III, Jerry Jacobson, Sandra Lavender, Ugnius Matkus, Tina Porter, Martin-Han Tran and Paul Vermillion, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3236823] [21-3058] [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant AMA Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/03/2022 by CM/ECF.[3236706] [21-3058] [Entered: 01/03/2022 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docket(#7) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant AMA Capital Management, LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25521235, FILED.[3236692] [21-3058] [Entered: 01/03/2022 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant AMA Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/28/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3234658] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/28/2021 07:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant AMA Capital Management, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/28/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3234656] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/28/2021 07:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3230085] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3230083] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3230079] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant AMA Capital Management, LLC, FILED. [3230074] [21-3058] [Entered: 12/17/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNP Paribas North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BNP Paribas Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Carlos Gonzalez, as Successor Trustee of the Baywi is a litigant

Latest cases where BARCLAYS BANK is a litigant