This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2021 at 20:47:44 (UTC).

Constantino Basile v. The Los Angeles Film School, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Constantino Basile filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Los Angeles Film School,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56276

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Defendants

U.S. DISTRICT COURT-CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA WESTERN DIVISION

NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS

Defendant / Appellees

KRIPKE ENTERPRISES, a California corporation

MITCHELL, SILBERBERG AND KNUPP, a California Corporation

BEVERLY HILLS POLICE DEPARTMENT

GOLD COAST CAB COMPANY

CHRISTOPHER NOLAN, an individual

THORNDAL, ARMSTRONG, DELK, BALKENBUSH AND EISINGER, a Nevada Corporation

CALDWELL, LESLIE & PROCTOR, a California corporation

THE LOS ANGELES FILM SCHOOL, LLC, DBA The Los Angeles Film School

TMZ, a California corporation

SCOTT FREE FILMS, LLC, a California corporation

TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

LANA WACHOWSKI, an individual

SONY PICTURES TELEVISION, a Delaware Corporation

SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., a Texas corporation

JONATHON NOLAN, an individual

OXNARD POLICE DEPARTMENT

JOHN AND JANE DOES, 1-10, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

CONSTANTINO BASILE

Oxnard, CA 93035

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carol M. Silberberg

Attorney at Berry Silberberg Stokes PC

155 North Lake Avenue, Suite 800

Pasadena, CA 91101

Richard B. Sheldon

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Emily B. Viglietta

Attorney at Willenken LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 3850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Joseph J. Ybarra Esquire

Attorney at Halpern May Ybarra Gelberg LLP

550 S. Hope Street, Suite 2330

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Byron Hollins

Attorney at Hollins & Associates

23801 Calabasas Road, Suite 100

Calabasas, CA 91302

Lyne Ann Richardson

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Evan W. Woolley

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

333 S. Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

Richard G. Grotch

Attorney at CODDINGTON, HICKS & DANFORTH

555 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood City, CA 94065

Jennie Kelly

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

305 West 3Rd Street

Oxnard, CA 93030

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Constantino Basile

4104 Baltic Street

Oxnard, CA 93035

Other Attorneys

Joan E. Trimble

Attorney at Callahan, Thompson, Sherman & Caudill, LLP

2601 Main Street, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Jessica R. MacGregor

Attorney at Long & Levit, LLP

465 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kevin Michael McCormick

Attorney at Lowthorp, Richards, McMillan, Miller & Templeman, APC

300 E. Esplanade Drive, Suite 850

Oxnard, CA 93036

Janice Marla Michaels Esquire

Attorney at Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman, LLP

2881 Business Park Court, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Steven Rob Disharoon Esquire

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning and Berman

201 1St Street, Suite 209

Petaluma, CA 94952

Jason R. Chermela Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Additional Document

#4

#7

#8

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 12 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Robert Leark. Date of service: 03/02/2021. [12021498] [20-56276] (Trimble, Joan) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Robert Leark. Date of service: 03/02/2021. [12021486] [20-56276]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. 03/04/2021 by SML] (Trimble, Joan) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Robert Leark. Date of service: 03/01/2021. [12019453] [20-56276]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 03/04/2021 by SML] (Trimble, Joan) [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Joseph J. Ybarra for party(s) Appellees' Andrew Wachowski ; Lana Wachowski;Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.; Legendary Pictures; Christopher Nolan; and Jonathon Nolan. [11955745] (DJV) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph J. Ybarra (Halpern May Ybarra Gelberg LLP - 550 S. Hope St. Ste. 2330, Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellees Legendary Pictures, Christopher Nolan, Jonathon Nolan, TMZ, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. Date of service: 01/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11955397] [20-56276] (Ybarra, Joseph) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed Appellant Constantino Basile motion to transmit exhibit. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/04/2021. [11954575] (QDL) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Received original and 7 copies of Appellant Constantino Basile opening brief of 16 pages (Informal: No). Served on 01/04/2021. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed. [11954311] (LA) [Entered: 01/06/2021 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docket(#6) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 4.00. Date paid: 12/23/2020. [11938757] (BY) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 501.00. Date paid: 12/18/2020. [11932818] (BY) [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Constantino Basile response to order to show cause dated 12/09/2020. Served on 12/14/2020. [11930210] (QDL) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the record reflects that this appeal may be frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellee may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. [11920377] (CKP) [Entered: 12/09/2020 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Constantino Basile motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/28/2020. [11912819] (JBS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Constantino Basile opening brief due 01/29/2021. Appellees Alston & Bird LLP, Amblin Entertainment, Inc., Beverly Hills Police Department, Caldwell, Leslie & Proctor, Ford Harrison, LLP, Gold Coast Cab Company, JAMS, Inc., John And Jane Does, Kripke Enterprises, Las Vegas Metro Police Department, Robert Leark, Legendary Pictures, Blake Lively, Los Angeles Superior Court-Van Nuys, Mitchell, Silberberg and Knupp, NBC Universal, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Christopher Nolan, Jonathon Nolan, Onza Partners SL, Onza Entertainment, Oxnard Police Department, Rio All-Suites Hotel and Casino- Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Scott Free Films, LLC, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, Southwest Airlines Co., TMZ, The Los Angeles Film School, LLC, Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Andrew Wachowski, Lana Wachowski and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. answering brief due 03/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11912816] (JBS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold Coast Cab Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CALDWELL, LESLIE & PROCTOR, a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where The Los Angeles Film School, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY PICTURES TELEVISION INC is a litigant