This case was last updated from PACER on 07/24/2021 at 05:36:16 (UTC).

ConocoPhillips Company, et al v. FERC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 ConocoPhillips Company filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1156

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ConocoPhillips Company

Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC

Exelon Corporation

NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark Richard Haskell Esquire

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1907288] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 09/07/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 08/23/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 08/23/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 09/07/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 09/07/2021 [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:05 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1907287] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1907285-2 ] [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:01 AM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1907285] of a decision by federal agency filed by ConocoPhillips Company, Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Exelon Corporation and NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC [Service Date: 07/21/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:00 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1907288] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 08/23/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 09/07/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 08/23/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 08/23/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 09/07/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 09/07/2021 [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1907287] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1907285-2 ] [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1907285] of a decision by federal agency filed by ConocoPhillips Company, Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Exelon Corporation and NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC [Service Date: 07/21/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1156] [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Direct Energy Business Marketing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Exelon Corporation is a litigant