This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/12/2020 at 06:20:53 (UTC).

Confederated Tribes, et al v. Steven Mnuchin

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Confederated Tribes filed an Other lawsuit against Steven Mnuchin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5204

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government, 20-cv-01059

Tulalip Tribes

Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians

Arctic Village Council, 20-cv-01059

Nondalton Tribal Council, 20-cv-01059

Rosebud Sioux Tribe, 20-cv-01059

Elk Valley Rancheria, California

Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, 20-cv-01059

San Carlos Apache Tribe

Akiak Native Community

Aleut Community of St. Paul Island

Quinault Indian Nation

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

Napaskiak, Incorporated

St. Mary's Native Corporation

Sea Lion Corporation

Akiachak, Limited

Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc.

Ahtna, Inc.

Defendant / Appellee

Steven T. Mnuchin, in his official capacity as Secretary of U.S. Department of the Treasury

Plaintiff / Appellant

Ute Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation, 20-cv-01070

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Wesley James Furlong Esquire

Attorney at Native American Rights Fund

745 West 4Th Avenue, Suite 502

Anchorage, AK 99501

Natalie A. Landreth

Attorney at Native American Rights Fund

745 West 4Th Avenue, Suite 502

Anchorage, AK 99501

Matthew Neil Newman

Attorney at Native American Rights Fund

745 West 4Th Avenue, Suite 502

Anchorage, AK 99501

Riyaz A. Kanji

Attorney at Kanji & Katzen, PLLC

303 Detroit Street, Suite 400

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Bradley G. Bledsoe Downes

Attorney at Elk Valley Rancheria, California

2332 Howland Hill Road

Crescent City, CA 95531

Nicole E. Ducheneaux

Attorney at Big Fire Law & Policy Group

1404 Fort Crook Road South

Bellevue, NE 68005

Alexander B. Ritchie

Attorney at San Carlos Apache Tribe

Po Box 40, 16 San Carlos Avenue

San Carlos, AZ 85550

Lori Brunner

Attorney at Quinault Office of the Attorney General

136 Cuitan Street

Taholah, WA 98587

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Erin Murphy

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel William Wolff

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Jonathan W. Katchen

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

1029 W. Third Avenue, Suite 550

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Tenny

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Adam C. Jed

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Michael S. Raab

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rollie Wilson

Attorney at Patterson Earnhart Real Bird & Wilson LLP

601 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004

Other Attorneys

Jennifer Bear Eagle

Attorney at Oglala Sioux Tribe

Po Box 1204

Pine Ridge, SD 57770

Eric Dahlstrom

Attorney at Rothstein Donatelli LLP

1501 W. Fountainhead Parkway, Suite 360

Tempe, AZ 85282

James H. Lister

Attorney at Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot, PC

1100 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 825

Washington, DC 20036

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Riyaz Kanji, on behalf of Appellees Akiak Native Community, Aleut Community of St. Paul Island, Asa'carsarmiut Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Picuris, Quinault Indian Nation, San Carlos Apache Tribe and Tulalip Tribes in 20-5204, Appellants Akiak Native Community, Aleut Community of St. Paul Island, Asa'carsarmiut Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Picuris, Quinault Indian Nation, San Carlos Apache Tribe and Tulalip Tribes in 20-5205, 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Kanji, Riyaz) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Paul D. Clement, on behalf of Appellees Ahtna, Inc., Akiachak, Limited, Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc., Association of ANCSA Regional Corporation Presidents/CEO's, Inc., Calista Corporation, Kwethluk, Incorporated, Sea Lion Corporation, St. Mary's Native Corporation and Napaskiak, Incorporated in 20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Adam C. Jed, on behalf of Appellee Steven T. Mnuchin in 20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Jed, Adam) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1860379] filed granting the joint motion for divided argument [ # 1859885-2 ], The following revised allocation of oral argument time will now apply: Appellants - 15 Minutes (to be divided as the parties see fit), Appellees - 15 Minutes (to be divided as the parties see fit). [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by on behalf of Appellees Akiak Native Community, Aleut Community of St. Paul Island, Asa'carsarmiut Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Picuris, Quinault Indian Nation, San Carlos Apache Tribe and Tulalip Tribes in 20-5204, Appellants Akiak Native Community, Aleut Community of St. Paul Island, Asa'carsarmiut Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Picuris, Quinault Indian Nation, San Carlos Apache Tribe and Tulalip Tribes in 20-5205, 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Kanji, Riyaz) [Entered: 09/04/2020 09:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Paul D. Clement, on behalf of Appellees Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc., Association of ANCSA Regional Corporation Presidents/CEO's, Inc., Ahtna, Inc., Akiachak, Limited, Calista Corporation, Kwethluk, Incorporated, Napaskiak, Incorporated, Sea Lion Corporation and St. Mary's Native Corporation in 20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Adam C. Jed, on behalf of Appellee Steven T. Mnuchin in 20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Jed, Adam) [Entered: 09/04/2020 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketFORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Jeffrey S. Rasmussen, on behalf of Appellees Arctic Village Council, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government, Navajo Nation, Nondalton Tribal Council, Rosebud Sioux Tribe and Appellant Ute Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation in 20-5204, Appellees Arctic Village Council, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government, Nondalton Tribal Council, Rosebud Sioux Tribe, Ute Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation and Appellant Navajo Nation in 20-5205, Appellants Arctic Village Council, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government, Nondalton Tribal Council, Rosebud Sioux Tribe and Appellees Navajo Nation and Ute Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation in 20-5209 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) [Entered: 09/04/2020 06:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1859885] regarding oral argument attorneys per side filed by Steven T. Mnuchin in 20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 ] Length Certification: 385 words. [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] (Jed, Adam) [Entered: 09/03/2020 07:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1859307] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant - 15 Minutes, AppelleeS - 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 09/04/2020 [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] [Entered: 09/01/2020 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1851758] filed by Paul D. Clement and co-counsel Erin E. Murphy, Ragan Naresh on behalf of Appellees Ahtna, Inc., Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc., Association of ANCSA Regional Corporation Presidents/CEO's, Inc., Calista Corporation, Kwethluk, Incorporated, Sea Lion Corporation, St. Mary's Native Corporation, Napaskiak, Incorporated and Akiachak, Limited in 20-5205, 20-5204. [20-5205, 20-5204] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1851757] filed consolidating case 20-5209 (Consolidation started 07/15/2020) with 20-5204 [20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209] [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1851658] for motion to expedite case [ # 1851631-2 ] filed by Akiak Native Community, Aleut Community of St. Paul Island, Asa'carsarmiut Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Picuris, Quinault Indian Nation, San Carlos Apache Tribe and Tulalip Tribes in 20-5205. [20-5205, 20-5204] (Kanji, Riyaz) [Entered: 07/14/2020 07:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1851631] to expedite case filed by Akiak Native Community, Aleut Community of St. Paul Island, Asa'carsarmiut Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Picuris, Quinault Indian Nation, San Carlos Apache Tribe and Tulalip Tribes in 20-5205 (Service Date: 07/14/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3,940 words. [20-5205, 20-5204] (Kanji, Riyaz) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1851594] filed by Adam C. Jed and co-counsel Michael S. Raab, Daniel Tenny on behalf of Appellee Steven T. Mnuchin in 20-5204, 20-5205. [20-5204, 20-5205] (Jed, Adam) [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1851593] filed consolidating cases 20-5205 (Consolidation started 07/14/2020) with 20-5204. [20-5204, 20-5205] [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER [1851586] sent regarding attorney membership to Bradley G. Bledsoe Downes for Elk Valley Rancheria, California, Lori Brunner for Quinault Indian Nation and Alexander B. Ritchie for San Carlos Apache Tribe. Application for Admission due 08/13/2020. [20-5204] [Entered: 07/14/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER [1851558] sent regarding attorney membership to Jennifer Bear Eagle for Oglala Sioux Tribe and Jonathan W. Katchen for Ahtna, Inc.. Application for Admission due 08/13/2020. [20-5204] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1851545] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01002-APM filed by Ute Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Indian Reservation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5204. [20-5204] [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5204] [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS is a litigant