This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/13/2020 at 06:00:17 (UTC).

Commonwealth School, Inc. v. Commonwealth Academy Holdings, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Commonwealth School, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Commonwealth Academy Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1112

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

JOHN A. FOLEY

COMMONWEALTH ACADEMY HOLDINGS LLC, a/k/a Commonwealth Academy

PROJECT-13, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

COMMONWEALTH SCHOOL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

John H. Ray III

Attorney at Ray & Counsel PC

10044 S Leavitt St

Chicago, IL 60643

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Juang

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

100 S 4Th St, Ste 1000

St Louis, MO 63102

Daniel B. Adams

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1 International Pl, 39Th Fl

Boston, MA 02210

Michael Lawrence Oliverio

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1 International Pl, 39Th Fl

Boston, MA 02210

Keith J. Grady

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

100 S 4Th St, Ste 1000

St Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #9

Exhibit H

Open Document #8

Exhibit G

Open Document #7

Exhibit F

Open Document #6

Exhibit E

Open Document #5

Exhibit D

Open Document #4

Exhibit C

Open Document #3

Exhibit B

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/20/2020 for appellant Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc.. Appendix due 05/20/2020 for appellant Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [20-1112] (GRC) [Entered: 04/10/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff-Appellee's motion for summary disposition pursuant to Local Rule 27.0(c). The motion is DENIED . The appeal shall proceed to briefing, with the issues raised in the motion to dismiss and response thereto reserved to the ultimate merits panel. The parties should address those issues in their briefs. A briefing schedule will enter in the ordinary course. [20-1112] (GRC) [Entered: 03/26/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth School, Inc. filed by Attorney M. Lawrence Oliverio. Certificate of service dated 03/20/2020. [20-1112] (MLO) [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case and RESPONSE to response [ # 6324720-2 ] filed by Appellee Commonwealth School, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/20/2020. [20-1112] (MLO) [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc. to motion [ # 6317973-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2020. [20-1112] (JHR) [Entered: 03/13/2020 08:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: Upon consideration, Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13's motion seeking an extension of time to file a response is granted. It is order that the time for appellants to file a response to appellee's motion to dismiss is enlarged to and including March 13, 2020. [20-1112] (GRC) [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC and Project-13, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/11/2020. [20-1112] (JHR) [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file a response to motion to dismiss [ # 6317973-2 ] filed by Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc. Certificate of service dated 02/28/2020. [20-1112] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JHR) [Entered: 02/28/2020 07:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/13/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Daniel B. Adams for Commonwealth School, Inc., Keith J. Grady for Commonwealth School, Inc. and Richard Juang for Commonwealth School, Inc.. [20-1112] (RMK) [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2020. [20-1112] (JHR) [Entered: 02/27/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCJA FORM 24 and transcript order form filed by Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2020. [20-1112] (JHR) [Entered: 02/27/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc. filed by Attorney John H. Ray, III. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2020. [20-1112] (JHR) [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal filed by Appellee Commonwealth School, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/18/2020. [20-1112] (MLO) [Entered: 02/18/2020 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #153) filed by Appellants Commonwealth Academy Holdings LLC, John A. Foley and Project-13, Inc.. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 02/27/2020. [20-1112] (MNH) [Entered: 02/13/2020 06:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith J. Grady

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Lawrence Oliverio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Juang