This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2019 at 06:04:34 (UTC).

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, et al v. President United States, et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Commonwealth of Pennsylvania filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against President United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1129

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants

PROFESSOR MICHAEL P. MORELAND

PROFESSOR CARL H. ESBECK

PROFESSOR RICHARD EPSTEIN

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

STATE OF ALABAMA

PROFESSOR MARY ANN GLENDON

STATE OF ARKANSAS

PROFESSOR DAVID F.FORTE

STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA

STATE OF MISSOURI

Defendant / Appellees

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

PRESIDENT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

Plaintiff / Appellees

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA

Petitioner / Appellant

LITTLE SISTERS OF THE POOR SAINTS PETER AND PAUL HOME

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Miles Coleman Esq.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough

104 South Main Street, Suite 900

Greenville, SC 29601

Jason R. LaFond Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Texas

209 West 14Th Street, 7Th Floor

Austin, TX 78711

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rebecca M. Kopplin Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Christopher Healy Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Justin M. Sandberg Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Scott W. Reid Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Glenn J. Moramarco Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Elspeth L.F. Hans Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

Division Of Law, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

Marc A. Krefetz Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

Division Of Law, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

Aimee D. Thomson Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nikole Brock Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Michael J. Fischer Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jonathan S. Goldman Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Mark L. Rienzi Esq.

Attorney at Becket Fund for Religious Liberty

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Nicholas M. Centrella Esq.

Attorney at Conrad O'Brien

1500 Market Street, West Tower, Suite 3900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Lori H. Windham Esq.

Attorney at Becket Fund for Religious Liberty

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

Robert Dunn Esq.

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

1881 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS BRIEF on behalf of Center for Reproductive Rights The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law The California Women;s Law Center GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders LatinoJustice PRLDEF Lawyers for Civil Rights Legal Momentum, Legal Voice The Mississippi Center in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/22/2019 by ECF. F.R.A.P. 29(a) Permission: NO. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] (DR) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:54 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ms. Dariely Rodriguez on behalf of Amicus Curiae Center for Reproductive Rights The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law The California Women;s Law Center GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders LatinoJustice PRLDEF Lawyers for Civil Rights Legal Momentum, Legal Voice The Mississippi Center. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] (DR) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: JOINT ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and State of New Jersey in 19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/18/2019 by ECF. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] - [Entry edited by the Clerk to reflect the correct event]--[Edited 03/19/2019 by MS] (MJF) [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:52 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Glenn J. Moramarco, Esq. for Appellee State of New Jersey in 19-1129, 19-1189. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1129, 19-1189] (GJM) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:18 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Mark L. Rienzi, Esq. for Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 17-3752, 19-1129 Letter advising of potential Oral Argument conflict.. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019. Service made by ECF. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (MLR) [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:01 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Michael J. Fischer, Esq. for Appellee Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in 19-1129, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1189. Certificate of Service dated 03/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1129, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1189] (MJF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 06:47 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Karen Schoen, Esq. for Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary United States Department of Labor, Secretary United States Department of Treasury, HHS, United States Department of Labor and United States Department of Treasury in 19-1189, Attorney Karen Schoen, Esq. for Appellants President United States of America, Secretary United States Department of Treasury, United States Department of Treasury, Acting Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary United States Department of Labor and United States Department of Labor in 18-1253. Certificate of Service dated 03/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] (KS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:22 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mark L. Rienzi, Esq. for Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 17-3752. Certificate of Service dated 03/07/2019. Service made by ECF. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (MLR) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:42 PM]

Open Document

Calendared for Tuesday, 05/21/2019. Calendar Clerk: CMH. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (CMH) [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: JOINT STATUS REPORT with Proposed Briefing Schedule and Request for Leave to File Overlength Principal Briefs and for Expedited Disposition 19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129.. Certificate of Service dated 01/28/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by PDB] (ADT) [Entered: 01/28/2019 08:43 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of Appellee(s) Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [19-1129] (ADT) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenn J. Moramarco on behalf of Appellee(s) State of New Jersey. [19-1129] (GJM) [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:16 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) on January 9, 2019, the Court stayed Nos. 17-3752 and 18-1253 pending the District Court's resolution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania's second motion for a preliminary injunction. As the District Court entered an order disposing of the motion on January 14, 2019, the stay is hereby lifted. As directed by the Court, the parties must file a joint status report setting forth a revised proposed briefing schedule on or before January 28, 2019. The proposed schedule should address all four of the appeals, filed. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (SLC) [Entered: 01/24/2019 08:23 AM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #3

Order

Open Document #2

Opinion

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS BRIEF on behalf of Center for Reproductive Rights The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law The California Women;s Law Center GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders LatinoJustice PRLDEF Lawyers for Civil Rights Legal Momentum, Legal Voice The Mississippi Center in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/22/2019 by ECF. F.R.A.P. 29(a) Permission: NO. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] (DR) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ms. Dariely Rodriguez on behalf of Amicus Curiae Center for Reproductive Rights The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law The California Women;s Law Center GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders LatinoJustice PRLDEF Lawyers for Civil Rights Legal Momentum, Legal Voice The Mississippi Center. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] (DR) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in 17-3752, 18-1253, Appellees Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and State of New Jersey in 19-1129, 19-1189 - Brief. Copies: 7. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (SJB) [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: JOINT ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and State of New Jersey in 19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/18/2019 by ECF. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] - [Entry edited by the Clerk to reflect the correct event]--[Edited 03/19/2019 by MS] (MJF) [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Glenn J. Moramarco, Esq. for Appellee State of New Jersey in 19-1129, 19-1189. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1129, 19-1189] (GJM) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Mark L. Rienzi, Esq. for Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 17-3752, 19-1129 Letter advising of potential Oral Argument conflict.. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019. Service made by ECF. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (MLR) [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Michael J. Fischer, Esq. for Appellee Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in 19-1129, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1189. Certificate of Service dated 03/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1129, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1189] (MJF) [Entered: 03/13/2019 06:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Karen Schoen, Esq. for Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary United States Department of Labor, Secretary United States Department of Treasury, HHS, United States Department of Labor and United States Department of Treasury in 19-1189, Attorney Karen Schoen, Esq. for Appellants President United States of America, Secretary United States Department of Treasury, United States Department of Treasury, Acting Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary United States Department of Labor and United States Department of Labor in 18-1253. Certificate of Service dated 03/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129] (KS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mark L. Rienzi, Esq. for Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 17-3752. Certificate of Service dated 03/07/2019. Service made by ECF. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (MLR) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Calendared for Tuesday, 05/21/2019. Calendar Clerk: CMH. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (CMH) [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 19-1129 received. (MLR) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 19-1129. (MLR) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in 19-1129. (MLR) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) Action on the requests for leave to file overlength briefs and for expedited disposition is hereby deferred. Within seven (7) days of the date of this order, the parties must file a supplemental motion providing the justification required under the Court's January 9, 2012 Standing Order regarding motions to exceed the word limitations of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. The parties must also clarify if the 16,000 word Appellants' briefs will be in addition to the briefs filed on September 21, 2018, or in place of those briefs. The parties should not file any briefs until the Court has ruled on the pending requests. It is noted that the record does not have to be filed by the District Court as it is available electronically. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (HAG) [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: JOINT STATUS REPORT with Proposed Briefing Schedule and Request for Leave to File Overlength Principal Briefs and for Expedited Disposition 19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129.. Certificate of Service dated 01/28/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1189, 17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by PDB] (ADT) [Entered: 01/28/2019 08:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of Appellee(s) Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [19-1129] (ADT) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Glenn J. Moramarco on behalf of Appellee(s) State of New Jersey. [19-1129] (GJM) [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) on January 9, 2019, the Court stayed Nos. 17-3752 and 18-1253 pending the District Court's resolution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania's second motion for a preliminary injunction. As the District Court entered an order disposing of the motion on January 14, 2019, the stay is hereby lifted. As directed by the Court, the parties must file a joint status report setting forth a revised proposed briefing schedule on or before January 28, 2019. The proposed schedule should address all four of the appeals, filed. [17-3752, 18-1253, 19-1129, 19-1189] (SLC) [Entered: 01/24/2019 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 01/24/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home in District Court No. 2-17-cv-04540. (SLC) [Entered: 01/23/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less