This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2020 at 06:34:43 (UTC).

Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, et al v. Mills, et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Mills. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1104

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

DURHAM, ME

WOOLWICH, ME

BOWDOINHAM, ME

BATH, ME

WEST BATH, ME

ELIOT, ME

BOWDOIN, ME

BRUNSWICK, ME

TOPSHAM, ME

Plaintiff / Appellees

FOX CABLE NETWORK SERVICES, LLC

COMCAST OF MAINE/NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC.

NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC

DISCOVERY, INC.

VIACOM, INC.

C-SPAN

CBS CORP.

A & E TELEVISION NETWORKS, LLC.

NEW ENGLAND SPORTS NETWORK LP

Defendant / Appellants

AARON M. FREY, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of Maine

JANET T. MILLS, in her official capacity as the Governor of Maine

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

John W. Conway

Attorney at Linnell, Choate & Webber

83 Pleasant Street, P.O. Box 190

Auburn, ME 04212-0190

Kristin M. Collins

Attorney at Preti Flaherty

45 Memorial Cir

Augusta, ME 04330

Philip R. Saucier

Attorney at Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson PA

100 Middle St, West Tower, Po Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

Eben Michael Albert

Attorney at Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson PA

100 Middle St, West Tower, Po Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

Roger R. Therriault

Attorney at Law Office of Roger R. Therriault

1 Front St

Bath, ME 04530

Stephen E.F. Langsdorf

Attorney at Preti Flaherty

45 Memorial Cir

Augusta, ME 04330

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joshua A. Tardy

Attorney at Rudman Winchell

84 Harlow St, Po Box 1401

Bangor, ME 04402-1401

Michael H. Herman

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th St, Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Matthew A. Brill

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th St, Nw, Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Joshua Aaron Randlett

Attorney at Rudman Winchell

84 Harlow St, Po Box 1401

Bangor, ME 04402-1401

Melanie A. Medina

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

1875 K St, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Michael D. Hurwitz

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

1875 K St, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Other Attorneys

John C. Ulin

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 S Figueroa St, 44Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Erin Lorraine Dozier

Attorney at National Association of Broadcasters

1771 N St Nw

Washington, DC 20036

William J. Kennedy

Attorney at Drummond & Drummond LLP

1 Monument Way

Portland, ME 04101

Richard Adam Kaplan

Attorney at National Association of Broadcasters

1771 N St Nw

Washington, DC 20036

James S. Blackburn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 S Figueroa St, 44Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Amy K. Tchao

Attorney at Drummond Woodsum

84 Marginal Way, Ste 600

Portland, ME 04101-2480

Jeffrey Taylor Piampiano

Attorney at Drummond Woodsum

84 Marginal Way, Ste 600

Portland, ME 04101-2480

Jessica L. Maher

Attorney at Moncure & Barnicle

Po Box 636

Brunswick, ME 04011

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Richard H. Griffin for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Melanie A. Medina for Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., Jessica L. Saba for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Kristin M. Collins for Brunswick, ME and Woolwich, ME, John W. Conway for Bowdoin, ME and Durham, ME, Richard Adam Kaplan for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, William J. Kennedy for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Stephen Blake Kinnaird for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, Stephen E.F. Langsdorf for Brunswick, ME, Jessica L. Maher for Phippsburg, ME, Amy K. Tchao for Harpswell, ME and Roger R. Therriault for Bath, ME. [20-1104] (GB) [Entered: 03/05/2020 08:52 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney James Tomberlin. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1104] (JT) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:49 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 03/04/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Richard H. Griffin for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Michael H. Herman for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Melanie A. Medina for Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., Jessica L. Saba for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Joshua A. Tardy for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., James S. Blackburn for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Kristin M. Collins for Brunswick, ME and Woolwich, ME, John W. Conway for Bowdoin, ME and Durham, ME, Erin Lorraine Dozier for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, Richard Adam Kaplan for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, William J. Kennedy for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Stephen Blake Kinnaird for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, Stephen E.F. Langsdorf for Brunswick, ME, Jessica L. Maher for Phippsburg, ME, Oscar Ramallo for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Philip R. Saucier for South Berwick, ME, Eliot, ME, Berwick, ME, Bowdoinham, ME, Freeport, ME and Topsham, ME, Amy K. Tchao for Harpswell, ME, Roger R. Therriault for Bath, ME and John C. Ulin for Motion Picture Association, Inc.. [20-1104] (GB) [Entered: 02/19/2020 10:57 AM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Oscar Ramallo for Not Party Motion Picture Association, Inc. Copy of Notice issued February 4, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1104] (JMK) [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:24 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Matthew T. Murchison. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1104] (MTM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:51 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Shannon Grammel. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1104] (SMG) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:49 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Matthew A. Brill. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1104] (MAB) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:43 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc. and NBC Universal Media, LLC filed by Attorney Michael D. Hurwitz. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1104] (MDH) [Entered: 02/12/2020 07:29 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc. and NBC Universal Media, LLC filed by Attorney David P. Murray. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1104] (DPM) [Entered: 02/12/2020 07:20 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1104] (MAS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:23 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1104] (MAS) [Entered: 02/10/2020 05:36 PM]

Open Document #2

Attachment A to Notice of Appearance

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Aaron M. Frey and Janet T. Mills indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2020. [20-1104] (CCT) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:54 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Aaron M. Frey and Janet T. Mills. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2020. [20-1104] (CCT) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:52 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Janet T. Mills and Aaron M. Frey filed by Attorney Christopher C. Taub. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2020. [20-1104] (CCT) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:50 PM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2020 for appellants Aaron M. Frey and Janet T. Mills. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [20-1104] (GB) [Entered: 03/19/2020 05:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Richard H. Griffin for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Melanie A. Medina for Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., Jessica L. Saba for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Kristin M. Collins for Brunswick, ME and Woolwich, ME, John W. Conway for Bowdoin, ME and Durham, ME, Richard Adam Kaplan for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, William J. Kennedy for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Stephen Blake Kinnaird for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, Stephen E.F. Langsdorf for Brunswick, ME, Jessica L. Maher for Phippsburg, ME, Amy K. Tchao for Harpswell, ME and Roger R. Therriault for Bath, ME. [20-1104] (GB) [Entered: 03/05/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney James Tomberlin. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-1104] (JT) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/04/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Richard H. Griffin for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Michael H. Herman for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Melanie A. Medina for Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., Jessica L. Saba for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., Joshua A. Tardy for Disney Enterprises, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc., James S. Blackburn for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Kristin M. Collins for Brunswick, ME and Woolwich, ME, John W. Conway for Bowdoin, ME and Durham, ME, Erin Lorraine Dozier for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, Richard Adam Kaplan for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, William J. Kennedy for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Stephen Blake Kinnaird for National Association of Broadcasters and Maine Association of Broadcasters, Stephen E.F. Langsdorf for Brunswick, ME, Jessica L. Maher for Phippsburg, ME, Oscar Ramallo for Motion Picture Association, Inc., Philip R. Saucier for South Berwick, ME, Eliot, ME, Berwick, ME, Bowdoinham, ME, Freeport, ME and Topsham, ME, Amy K. Tchao for Harpswell, ME, Roger R. Therriault for Bath, ME and John C. Ulin for Motion Picture Association, Inc.. [20-1104] (GB) [Entered: 02/19/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Oscar Ramallo for Not Party Motion Picture Association, Inc. Copy of Notice issued February 4, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1104] (JMK) [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Matthew T. Murchison. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1104] (MTM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Shannon Grammel. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1104] (SMG) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Matthew A. Brill. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1104] (MAB) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc. and NBC Universal Media, LLC filed by Attorney Michael D. Hurwitz. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1104] (MDH) [Entered: 02/12/2020 07:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc. and NBC Universal Media, LLC filed by Attorney David P. Murray. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1104] (DPM) [Entered: 02/12/2020 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 02/12/2020. [20-1104] (MAS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1104] (MAS) [Entered: 02/10/2020 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees A & E Television Networks, LLC., C-SPAN, CBS Corp., Comcast of Maine/New Hampshire, Inc., Discovery, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Cable Network Services, LLC, NBC Universal Media, LLC, New England Sports Network LP and Viacom, Inc. filed by Attorney Joshua A. Randlett. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1104] (JAR) [Entered: 02/10/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Aaron M. Frey and Janet T. Mills indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2020. [20-1104] (CCT) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Aaron M. Frey and Janet T. Mills. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2020. [20-1104] (CCT) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Janet T. Mills and Aaron M. Frey filed by Attorney Christopher C. Taub. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2020. [20-1104] (CCT) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #96) filed by Appellants Aaron M. Frey and Janet T. Mills. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 02/18/2020. [20-1104] (MNH) [Entered: 02/04/2020 07:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIACOM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey T. Piampiano