This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/30/2021 at 06:04:06 (UTC).

Colvin v. Bickham

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Colvin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bickham. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-30115

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

Robert C. Tanner, Warden, B. B. Rayburn Correctional Center

Edward Bickham, Warden, B. B. Rayburn Correctional Center

Petitioner / Appellant

James L. Colvin

Angie, LA 70426-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

James L. Colvin

Attorney at B.B. Rayburn Correctional Center

27268 Highway 21

Angie, LA 70426-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Unfiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion for Extension of Time to file Appeal received from Appellant Mr. James L. Colvin because the motion is premature. [21-30115] (MRW) [Entered: 03/25/2021 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising the parties of the updated caption [21-30115] (CB) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for dc# 22 motion for reconsideration. [9519624-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-30115] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James L. Colvin. [21-30115] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/01/2021 04:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robert C. Tanner, Warden, B. B. Rayburn Correctional Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Colvin