This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 06:04:54 (UTC).

Columbia Insurance Company v. William Reynolds, Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Columbia Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against William Reynolds, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1266

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER KAMIL WAYMER, d/b/a QE Trucking, individually and

Defendant / Appellants

WILLIAM EDMUND REYNOLDS, JR.

ANGELA D. REYNOLDS

Plaintiff / Appellee

COLUMBIA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Bert Glenn Utsey III

Attorney at PETERS, MURDAUGH, PARKER, ELTZROTH & DETRICK, PA

123 South Walter Street, P. O. Box 1164

Walterboro, SC 29488

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Kathleen Chewning Barnes Esq.

Attorney at BARNES LAW FIRM, LLC

P. O. Box 897

Hampton, SC 29924

Mark Brandon Tinsley

Attorney at GOODING & GOODING, PA

P. O. Box 1000

Allendale, SC 29810-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Brian Patrick Crotty

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

P. O. Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

G. Mark Phillips

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

151 Meeting Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Allen Mattison Bogan

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

P. O. Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Charles Mitchell Brown

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

P. O. Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Blake Terence Williams

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

P. O. Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

#20

(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ] Number of days granted: 63. Opening brief and appendix due 07/06/2020. Response brief due 08/05/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000727603] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] AW [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:27 AM]

#19

(#17) MOTION by Christopher Kamil Waymer in 20-1265, Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266, 20-1267 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 07/03/2020.. Date and method of service: 04/24/2020 ecf. [1000727383] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 04/24/2020 10:10 AM]

#18

(#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/04/2020. Response Brief due 06/03/2020 [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] AW [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:15 PM]

#16

(#15) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] MRB [Entered: 03/23/2020 09:35 AM]

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000705686] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:55 PM]

13 #2

Additional Document

13 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Kamil Waymer in 20-1265. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000705603] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Bert Utsey [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:02 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bert G. Utsey III for Christopher Kamil Waymer in 20-1265. [1000705537] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Bert Utsey [Entered: 03/19/2020 02:20 PM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702698] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:39 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Blake T. Williams for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702694] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:36 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Mattison Bogan for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702693] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:34 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Mitchell Brown for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702688] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:31 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian P. Crotty for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702685] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:27 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark B. Tinsley for Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266. [1000701193] [20-1266, 20-1265, 20-1267] Mark Tinsley [Entered: 03/12/2020 03:35 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-02975-RMG. Case manager: AWalker. [20-1266] AW [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:13 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kathleen C. Barnes for Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266. [1000697141] [20-1266, 20-1265, 20-1267] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:30 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1266, 20-1267 with 20-1265 (L). Copies to all parties. [1000696907] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] AW [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:50 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ] Number of days granted: 63. Opening brief and appendix due 07/06/2020. Response brief due 08/05/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000727603] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] AW [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION by Christopher Kamil Waymer in 20-1265, Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266, 20-1267 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 07/03/2020.. Date and method of service: 04/24/2020 ecf. [1000727383] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 04/24/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/04/2020. Response Brief due 06/03/2020 [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] AW [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] MRB [Entered: 03/23/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000705686] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr.. [20-1266] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher Kamil Waymer in 20-1265. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000705603] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Bert Utsey [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bert G. Utsey III for Christopher Kamil Waymer in 20-1265. [1000705537] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Bert Utsey [Entered: 03/19/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702698] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Blake T. Williams for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702694] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Mattison Bogan for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702693] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Mitchell Brown for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702688] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian P. Crotty for Columbia Insurance Company in 20-1267. [1000702685] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] Blake Williams [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark B. Tinsley for Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266. [1000701193] [20-1266, 20-1265, 20-1267] Mark Tinsley [Entered: 03/12/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kathleen C. Barnes for Angela D. Reynolds and William Edmund Reynolds, Jr. in 20-1266. [1000697141] [20-1266, 20-1265, 20-1267] Kathleen Barnes [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1266, 20-1267 with 20-1265 (L). Copies to all parties. [1000696907] [20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1267] AW [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-02975-RMG.. [20-1266] AW [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-02975-RMG. Case manager: AWalker. [20-1266] AW [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMBIA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bert Glenn Utsey, III