This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 06:03:57 (UTC).

Collier v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Collier filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-467

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Petitioner / Appellant

Andre Collier

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Richard M. Tucker Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Andre Collier

Attorney at United States Penitentiary

P.O. Box 1000

Lewisburg, PA 17837

 

Court Documents

#13

(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to extend time for the filling of certificate of appealability, [ # 11 ], [ # 13 ], [ # 17 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED.[2541085] [19-467] [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:02 PM]

#22

(#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Andre Collier, FILED. Service date 04/08/2019 by US mail.[2539790] [19-467] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:35 AM]

#15

(#15) ORDER, dated 03/21/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/11/2019,unless Appellant Andre Collier,moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2523030] [19-467] [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:58 PM]

#7

(#8) ATTORNEY, Richard M. Tucker, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney David C. James, SUBSTITUTED.[2506506] [19-467] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:15 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 01/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2504272] [19-467] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:13 AM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2504302] [19-467] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:22 AM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#29

(#29) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time for 45-days, to June 3, 2019, to file the application for a certificate of appealability. [ # 24 ] filed by Appellant Andre Collier, by RSP, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2542443][29] [19-467] [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:16 PM]

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2506527] [19-467] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:24 PM]

#24

(#24) MOTION, to extend time for the filling of certificate of appealibilty, on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by US mail.[2541083] [19-467] [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:01 PM]

#19

(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [18], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2528386] [19-467] [Entered: 03/29/2019 09:41 AM]

#17

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to extend time to file certificate of appealability, [16], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2526693] [19-467] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:01 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#14

No Description Available

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time for 45-days, to June 3, 2019, to file the application for a certificate of appealability. [ # 24 ] filed by Appellant Andre Collier, by RSP, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2542443][29] [19-467] [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to extend time for the filling of certificate of appealability, [ # 11 ], [ # 13 ], [ # 17 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED.[2541085] [19-467] [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION, to extend time for the filling of certificate of appealibilty, on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by US mail.[2541083] [19-467] [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [ # 19 ], [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED.[2539793] [19-467] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Andre Collier, FILED. Service date 04/08/2019 by US mail.[2539790] [19-467] [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [18], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2528386] [19-467] [Entered: 03/29/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#18) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by US mail.[2528382] [19-467] [Entered: 03/29/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to extend time to file certificate of appealability, [16], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2526693] [19-467] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#16) MOTION, to extend time to file certificate of appealability on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by US mail.[2526685] [19-467] [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER, dated 03/21/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/11/2019,unless Appellant Andre Collier,moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2523030] [19-467] [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • (#12) MOTION, to extend time to file certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED. No Service.[2517971] [19-467] [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to extend time to file a certificate of appealability, [10], on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED.[2512708] [19-467] [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#10) MOTION, to extend time to file a certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, FILED. No Service.[2512706] [19-467] [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2506527] [19-467] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY, Richard M. Tucker, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney David C. James, SUBSTITUTED.[2506506] [19-467] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF. [2506499] [19-467] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2504302] [19-467] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2504281] [19-467] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 01/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2504272] [19-467] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andre Collier, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2504259] [19-467] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.