This case was last updated from PACER on 07/25/2020 at 09:59:38 (UTC).

Coleman-Domanoski, et al v. St. Paul Guardian Insurance, et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Coleman-Domanoski filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against St Paul Guardian Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1191

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., AKA St. Paul Fire Guardian Insurance Company

ST. PAUL GUARDIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, AKA St. Paul Fire Guardian Insurance Company

Plaintiff / Appellants

MALLORY COLEMAN-DOMANOSKI

JOSHAUA COLEMAN-DOMANOSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Evan B. Stephenson

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Elayna M. Fiene

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dale A. Gaar

1600 Stout Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202-0000

Pete L. Ramirez

16285 West 71St Place

Arvada, CO 80007

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10757713] Response filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company to Motion to Abate Appeal Pending Decision by Colorado Supreme Court. Served on 07/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1191] EBS [Entered: 07/23/2020 05:05 PM]

Open Document

[10751953] Motion filed by Appellees St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. to extend time to file a response until 07/23/2020. Served on: 07/02/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1191] EMF [Entered: 07/02/2020 03:56 PM]

Open Document

[10751783] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellees to file a response to appellants' motion to abate case. Response due on 07/09/2020 for St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company. Served on 07/02/2020. [20-1191] [Entered: 07/02/2020 10:51 AM]

Open Document

[10751604] Motion filed by Appellants Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski to abate case. Served on: 07/01/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1191] DAG [Entered: 07/01/2020 06:44 PM]

Open Document

[10751270] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 08/19/2020 for Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/30/2020 03:28 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10746108] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elayna Fiene and Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/09/2020 09:55 AM]

Open Document

[10745898] Entry of appearance filed by Pete L Ramirez for Mallory Coleman-Domanoski and Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:15 PM]

Open Document

[10745893] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dale A. Gaar for Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1191] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:09 PM]

Open Document

[10745889] Notice received from Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1191] DAG [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:02 PM]

Open Document

[10745886] Docketing statement filed by Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] DAG [Entered: 06/08/2020 02:59 PM]

Open Document #2

Letter

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10757713] Response filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company to Motion to Abate Appeal Pending Decision by Colorado Supreme Court. Served on 07/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1191] EBS [Entered: 07/23/2020 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket[10751978] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellees' motion to extend time to file response the appellants' motion to abate. Response due on or before 07/23/2020 for St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company. Served on 07/02/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-1191] [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10751953] Motion filed by Appellees St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. to extend time to file a response until 07/23/2020. Served on: 07/02/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1191] EMF [Entered: 07/02/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10751783] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellees to file a response to appellants' motion to abate case. Response due on 07/09/2020 for St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company. Served on 07/02/2020. [20-1191] [Entered: 07/02/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10751604] Motion filed by Appellants Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski to abate case. Served on: 07/01/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1191] DAG [Entered: 07/01/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10751270] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 08/19/2020 for Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/30/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10748356] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 06/30/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-1191] [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10746108] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elayna Fiene and Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/09/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket[10746083] Entry of appearance submitted by Evan Bennett Stephenson and Elayna M. Fiene for Appellees St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] --[Edited 06/09/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/9/2020.] EBS [Entered: 06/09/2020 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket[10745938] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/08/2020. TEXT ONLY entry. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/20/2020 for Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/08/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745898] Entry of appearance filed by Pete L Ramirez for Mallory Coleman-Domanoski and Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket[10745895] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/15/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1191] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745893] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dale A. Gaar for Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1191] [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745889] Notice received from Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1191] DAG [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10745886] Docketing statement filed by Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] DAG [Entered: 06/08/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket[10745883] Entry of appearance submitted by Dale A. Gaar for Appellants Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1191] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 06/08/2020 by NA] DAG [Entered: 06/08/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket[10745857] Entry of appearance submitted by Pete L. Ramirez for Appellants Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/08/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/08/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 6/8/20.] [20-1191] PLR [Entered: 06/08/2020 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10742515] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/26/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 06/09/2020 for Joshaua Coleman-Domanoski and Mallory Coleman-Domanoski. Notice of appearance due on 06/09/2020 for St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Inc. and St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company [20-1191] [Entered: 05/26/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPAN is a litigant