This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2021 at 06:01:47 (UTC).

United States of America v. Coffin

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 United States of America filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Coffin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2680

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

 

Party Details

Appellee and Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Defendant / Appellant and Petitioner / Appellant

John Coffin

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Rajit Singh Dosanjh

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

P.O. Box 7198, 100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

Defendant / Appellant and Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

John Coffin

Attorney at Federal Correctional Institution

P.O. Box 2000

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Steven David Clymer

P.O. Box 7198, 100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/20/2021, RECEIVED.[3199288] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:14 AM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3199297] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:19 AM]

6 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

6 #2

Supporting Document

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party John Coffin, FILED. Service date 11/03/2021 by US mail.[3208316] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:06 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION, Motion for reduction of sentence, on behalf of Appellant John Coffin, FILED. Service date 11/03/2021 by US mail.[3208321] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:08 PM]

7 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

7 #2

Supporting Document

#14

(#14) CAPTION, Party designations changed for Appellee United States of America and Appellant John Coffin, AMENDED.[3208743] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/10/2021 09:30 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CAPTION, Party designations changed for Appellee United States of America and Appellant John Coffin, AMENDED.[3208743] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/10/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY, Rajit S. Dosanjh, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Steven D. Clymer, SUBSTITUTED.[3208050] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/09/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/09/2021 by US mail. [3207951] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/09/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION, Motion for reduction of sentence, on behalf of Appellant John Coffin, FILED. Service date 11/03/2021 by US mail.[3208321] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party John Coffin, FILED. Service date 11/03/2021 by US mail.[3208316] [21-2680] [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/27/2021 by US mail.[3200950] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3199297] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3199289] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/20/2021, RECEIVED.[3199288] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John Coffin, FILED. [3199281] [21-2680] [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven David Clymer