This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 06:03:15 (UTC).

Cobb v. Haddon, et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Cobb filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Haddon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4094

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FNU BROWN, Captain

FNU NORDELL, Captain

FNU ROSS, Sgt.

FNU JOHNSON, Sgt.

FNU ZIMMERMAN, Lt.

FNU HAYES, Captain

FNU REDDING, Captain

FNU MICHOLAS, Mrs. Board of Pardons old chair person

FNU ATHONEY, Lt.

FNU BLACKBURN, Captain

FNU HOWARD, Lt.

FNU NICHOLAS

FNU ROBERTS, Sgt.

FNU HANSEN, Lt.

FNU FICKHERT, Lt.

LARRY BENZON, Warden Utah State Prison

MIKE HADDON, Executive Director, Utah State Prison

KENT DEMILL, Board of Pardons chair person

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRENT MAYON COBB

Draper, UT 84020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brent Mayon Cobb

Attorney at Utah State Prison

P.O. Box 250

Draper, UT 84020

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10672106] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellant is given another opportunity to comply with the requirements of the prison mailbox rule. See order for more detailed information. Appellant's response due on 09/10/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Served on 08/20/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document

[10672094] Appellant's memorandum in support of memorandum brief filed by Brent Mayon Cobb. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document

[10670060] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file their memorandum brief until 09/11/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. No further extensions will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 08/12/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

[10670032] Appellant's motion filed by Brent Mayon Cobb to extend time to file a memorandum brief (45 days). Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document

[10666238] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. We will provide the appellant a second and final opportunity to demonstrate that he complied with the prison mailbox rule in mailing the notice of appeal. Appellant's supplemental memorandum brief due 08/12/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Served on 07/26/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

[10666140] Appellant's memorandum brief filed by Brent Mayon Cobb. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:39 PM]

Open Document

[10665938] Entry of appearance filed by Brent Mayon Cobb. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:45 PM]

Open Document

[10665375] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified appellant's motion to extend time to file apet memo brief. Appellant's memorandum brief due 08/09/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. No further extensions of time will be granted on the Clerk's authority. Served on 07/24/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:02 AM]

Open Document

[10664837] Appellant's motion filed by Brent Mayon Cobb to extend time to file appellant's memorandum brief until 08/22/2019. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:51 PM]

Open Document

[10661510] Order filed by Clerk of the Court considering this case for summary disposition under 10 Cir. R. 27. Within 14 days from the date of this order the appellant shall file a memorandum brief addressing whether he can establish timely filing of this notice of appeal. Appellant's memorandum brief due 07/23/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 07/09/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:58 PM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10672106] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellant is given another opportunity to comply with the requirements of the prison mailbox rule. See order for more detailed information. Appellant's response due on 09/10/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Served on 08/20/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10672094] Appellant's memorandum in support of memorandum brief filed by Brent Mayon Cobb. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670060] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file their memorandum brief until 09/11/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. No further extensions will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 08/12/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670032] Appellant's motion filed by Brent Mayon Cobb to extend time to file a memorandum brief (45 days). Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666238] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. We will provide the appellant a second and final opportunity to demonstrate that he complied with the prison mailbox rule in mailing the notice of appeal. Appellant's supplemental memorandum brief due 08/12/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Served on 07/26/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666140] Appellant's memorandum brief filed by Brent Mayon Cobb. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665938] Entry of appearance filed by Brent Mayon Cobb. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665375] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified appellant's motion to extend time to file apet memo brief. Appellant's memorandum brief due 08/09/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. No further extensions of time will be granted on the Clerk's authority. Served on 07/24/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664837] Appellant's motion filed by Brent Mayon Cobb to extend time to file appellant's memorandum brief until 08/22/2019. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10661510] Order filed by Clerk of the Court considering this case for summary disposition under 10 Cir. R. 27. Within 14 days from the date of this order the appellant shall file a memorandum brief addressing whether he can establish timely filing of this notice of appeal. Appellant's memorandum brief due 07/23/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 07/09/2019. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10661393] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/09/2019. Fee or 1915 forms due 08/08/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. Notice of appearance due on 08/08/2019 for Brent Mayon Cobb. [19-4094] [Entered: 07/09/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less