This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2019 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

Cobalt International Energy, et al v. Illinois National Ins Co., et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Cobalt International Energy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Illinois National Ins Co . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20519

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiffs

JOHN P. WILKIRSON

JAMES W. FARNSWORTH

GAMCO GLOBAL GOLD, NATURAL RESOURCES & INCOME TRUST

KENNETH A. PONTARELLI

JON A. MARSHALL

MYLES W. SCOGGINS

GAMCO NATURAL RESOURCES, GOLD & INCOME TRUST

JACK E. GOLDEN

N. JOHN LANCASTER, JR.

PETER R. CONEWAY

KENNETH W. MOORE, JR.

WILLIAM P. UTT

D. JEFF VAN STEENBERGEN

MARTIN H. YOUNG

J. HARDY MURCHISON

HENRY CORNELL

JOSEPH H. BRYANT

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant

ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellant

ALTERRA AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

COBALT INTERNATIONAL ENERGY, INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Robert P. Scott Jr.

Attorney at Blank Rome, L.L.P.

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Andrew J. Entwistle

Attorney at Entwistle & Cappucci L.L.P.

500 W. 2Nd Street

Austin, TX 78701

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Ronald J. Restrepo

Attorney at Doyle, Restrepo, Harvin & Robbins, L.L.P.

440 Louisiana Street, Lyric Centre

Houston, TX 77002

Kristin V. Gallagher

Attorney at Kennedys

120 Mountain View Boulevard, P.O. Box 650

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

Daisy Khambatta

Attorney at Kennedys CMK, L.L.P.

3821 Juniper Trace

Austin, TX 78738

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Marc Daniel Cabrera Esq.

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Frederick Perlis Esq.

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

300 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Appellants/Petitioners Allied World and Alterra's Joint Reply Brief Filed

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Appellee/Respondent Brief Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Appellants/Petitioners Joint Opening Brief Filed

Open Document #2

Unfiled Document

Open Document #1

BR-9 Letter

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Paper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellant Allied World Assurance Company in 19-20519 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-20519] (CAG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • BRIEFING COMPLETE. [19-20519] (CAG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE FILED stating that no Appellee's brief will be filed. E/Res's Brief deadline canceled. Date of Service: 08/28/2019 [19-20519] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER FILED by Appellees GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust and GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust stating that no Intervenor's Brief will be filed. Date of Service: 08/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cabrera, Gallagher, Khambatta, Perlis, Restrepo; Attorney for Appellees: Entwistle, Scott [19-20519] (Andrew J. Entwistle ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANTS' JOINT REPLY BRIEF FILED Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/29/2019 **OVERNIGHT** for Appellants Allied World Assurance Company and Alterra America Insurance Company. [19-20519] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Allied World Assurance Company. Date of service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cabrera, Gallagher, Khambatta, Perlis, Restrepo; Attorney for Appellees: Entwistle, Scott [19-20519] (Kristin V. Gallagher ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Paper copies of Appellee Brief filed by Appellees Mr. Joseph H. Bryant, Mr. James W. Farnsworth, Mr. John P. Wilkirson, Mr. Peter R. Coneway, Mr. Henry Cornell, Mr. Jack E. Golden, Mr. Jon A. Marshall, Mr. J. Hardy Murchison, Mr. Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Mr. Myles W. Scoggins, Mr. D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, Mr. William P. Utt, Cobalt International Energy, Incorporated, Mr. Martin H. Young, Mr. Kenneth W. Moore, Jr. and Mr. N. John Lancaster, Jr. in 19-20519 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-20519] (CMB) [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLEES' BRIEF FILED by Cobalt International Energy, Incorporated, Mr. Joseph H. Bryant, Mr. Peter R. Coneway, Mr. Henry Cornell, Mr. James W. Farnsworth, Mr. Jack E. Golden, Mr. N. John Lancaster, Jr., Mr. Jon A. Marshall, Mr. Kenneth W. Moore, Jr., Mr. J. Hardy Murchison, Mr. Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Mr. Myles W. Scoggins, Mr. William P. Utt, Mr. D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, Mr. John P. Wilkirson and Mr. Martin H. Young. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/26/2019 for Appellees Joseph H. Bryant, Cobalt International Energy, Incorporated, Peter R. Coneway, Henry Cornell, James W. Farnsworth, Jack E. Golden, N. John Lancaster Jr., Jon A. Marshall, Kenneth W. Moore Jr., J. Hardy Murchison, Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Myles W. Scoggins, William P. Utt, D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, John P. Wilkirson and Martin H. Young. [19-20519] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Cobalt International Energy, Incorporated. Date of service: 08/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cabrera, Gallagher, Khambatta, Perlis, Restrepo; Attorney for Appellees: Entwistle, Scott [19-20519] (Robert P. Scott Jr.) [Entered: 08/20/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daisy Khambatta for party(s) Appellant Allied World Assurance Company, in case 19-20519 [19-20519] (ABT) [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20519] (Daisy Khambatta ) [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Paper copies of Record Excerpts [ # 9118181-2 ] received as sufficient. Sufficient Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [19-20519] (CMB) [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Allied World Assurance Company in 19-20519 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [19-20519] (CAS) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kristin V. Gallagher for party(s) Appellant Allied World Assurance Company, in case 19-20519 [19-20519] (JMW) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20519] (Michael Frederick Perlis ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew J. Entwistle for Appellee GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust in 19-20519, Attorney Andrew J. Entwistle for Appellee GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust in 19-20519 [19-20519] (CCR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20519] (Kristin V. Gallagher ) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: caption correction [19-20519] (CAS) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Andrew J. Entwistle for GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust and GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20519] (Andrew J. Entwistle ) [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20519] (DDL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PERMISSION TO APPEAL GRANTED. Case transferred from miscellaneous case number 19-90013. Fee due on 08/06/2019 for Appellants Allied World Assurance Company and Alterra America Insurance Company. A/Pet's Brief due on 08/06/2019 for Appellants Allied World Assurance Company and Alterra America Insurance Company. Appellee's Brief due on 08/20/2019 for Appellees Joseph H. Bryant, Cobalt International Energy, Incorporated, Peter R. Coneway, Henry Cornell, James W. Farnsworth, GAMCO Global Gold, Natural Resources & Income Trust, GAMCO Natural Resources, Gold & Income Trust, Jack E. Golden, N. John Lancaster Jr., Jon A. Marshall, Kenneth W. Moore Jr., J. Hardy Murchison, Kenneth A. Pontarelli, Myles W. Scoggins, William P. Utt, D. Jeff Van Steenbergen, John P. Wilkirson and Martin H. Young. Reply Brief due on 08/27/2019 for Appellants Allied World Assurance Company and Alterra America Insurance Company [19-20519] (CAS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • EXPEDITED ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:19-CV-734. Electronic ROA due on 07/26/2019. [19-20519] (CAS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Allied World Assurance Company and Alterra America Insurance Company [19-20519] (CAS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COBALT INTERNATIONAL ENERGY, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTERRA AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied World Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Philip Scott, Jr.