This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2020 at 06:06:13 (UTC).

Clinton Casey v. Arconic, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Clinton Casey filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Arconic, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35250

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ARCONIC, INC.

ALCOA CORPORATION, FKA Alcoa, Inc.

P-G INDUSTRIES INC., successor in interest Pryor Giggey Co Inc

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

CLINTON E. CASEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark B. Tuvim Esquire

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Kevin J. Craig Esquire

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Jason W. Anderson Esquire

Attorney at Carney Badley Spellman, P.S.

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

Michael Barr King

Attorney at Carney Badley Spellman, P.S.

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

Brian Smith

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield

999 Third Avenue, Suite 3760

Seattle, WA 98104

Richard G. Gawlowski

Attorney at WILSON SMITH COCHRAN & DICKERSON

901 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98164

Richard G. Gawlowski Esquire

Attorney at Wilson Smith Cochran Dickerson

901 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98164-2050

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Matthew P. Bergman

Attorney at Bergman Draper Oslund Udo, PLLC

821 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clinton E. Casey Correspondence: Notice for COVID-19 Extension to File Brief. Date of service: 05/06/2020 [11682378] [20-35250] (Bergman, Matthew) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:02 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11661713] (LW) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:23 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/07/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11640538] (MS) [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:11 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clinton E. Casey Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/23/2020. [11638154] [20-35250] (Bergman, Matthew) [Entered: 03/23/2020 09:55 AM]

1 #5

Counseled Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: EU): Updated deadlines. Automatic 60-day extension (notice filed at Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]). Appellant Clinton E. Casey opening brief due 07/17/2020. Appellees Alcoa Corporation, Arconic, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and P-G Industries Inc. answering brief due 08/17/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11682470] (EU) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clinton E. Casey Correspondence: Notice for COVID-19 Extension to File Brief. Date of service: 05/06/2020 [11682378] [20-35250] (Bergman, Matthew) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Jason W. Anderson for party(s) Appellee Alcoa Corporation. [11663984] (RL) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jason W. Anderson (Carney Badley Spellman, PS) for Appellee Alcoa Corporation. Date of service: 04/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11663977] [20-35250] (Anderson, Jason) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Michael Barr King for party(s) Appellee Alcoa Corporation. [11663963] (RL) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Barr King (Carney Badley Spellman, PS, 701 Fifth Ave., Suite 3600, Seattle, WA 98104) for Appellee Alcoa Corporation. Date of service: 04/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11663951] [20-35250] (King, Michael) [Entered: 04/17/2020 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11661713] (LW) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/07/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11640538] (MS) [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/23/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11638614]. [20-35250] (AD) [Entered: 03/23/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clinton E. Casey Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/23/2020. [11638154] [20-35250] (Bergman, Matthew) [Entered: 03/23/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Clinton E. Casey Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/25/2020. Appellant Clinton E. Casey opening brief due 05/18/2020. Appellees Alcoa Corporation, Arconic, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and P-G Industries Inc. answering brief due 06/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11633575] (JPD) [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P-G INDUSTRIES, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PRYOR GIGGEY CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Arconic Inc. is a litigant