This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2020 at 09:07:16 (UTC).

Clint Fisher v. Marina Secchitano, et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Clint Fisher filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Marina Secchitano,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35310

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MARINA SECCHITANO

ROBERT ESTRADA

ALICE NG

PETER HART

LEE EGLAND

ADAM SMITH

BRIAN DODGE

GAIL MCCORMICK

MATT HAINLEY

MIKE O'CONNOR

DONOVAN DUNCAN

JOHN SKOW

PATRICK MURPHY

ROBERT RELLER

Plaintiff / Appellant

CLINT FISHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Greg K. Hitchcock

Attorney at Brownstein Rask, LLP

1200 S.W. Main Street

Portland, OR 97205

Christopher Joseph Boran

Attorney at Morgan Lewis

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Steve Douglas Larson Esquire

Attorney at Stoll Berne

209 S.W. Oak Street

Portland, OR 97204

Cody Berne

Attorney at Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter, P.C.

209 Sw Oak Street

Portland, OR 97204

Lydia Anderson-Dana

Attorney at Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter, P.C.

209 Sw Oak Street

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #5

ER Vol V

11 #4

ER Vol IV

11 #3

ER Vol III

11 #2

ER Vol II

11 #1

ER Vol I

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#2

1 #4

Counseled Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 10 ] and excerpts of record [ # 11 ] submitted by Clint Fisher are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11708936] (LA) [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Clint Fisher. Date of service: 06/02/2020. [11708896] [20-35310] (Anderson-Dana, Lydia) [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Clint Fisher. Date of service: 06/02/2020. [11708881] [20-35310] (Anderson-Dana, Lydia) [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11686411] (CL) [Entered: 05/11/2020 12:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/11/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11671014] (CL) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clint Fisher Correspondence: Appellant's Notice Re: Transcripts. Date of service: 04/17/2020 [11664271] [20-35310] (Berne, Cody) [Entered: 04/17/2020 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clint Fisher Correspondence: Representation Statement. Date of service: 04/17/2020 [11664264] [20-35310] (Berne, Cody) [Entered: 04/17/2020 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Lydia Anderson-Dana for party(s) Appellant Clint Fisher, in case 20-35310. [11659389] (CW) [Entered: 04/13/2020 02:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lydia Anderson-Dana (Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter P.C. 209 S.W. Oak St, Suite 500, Portland, OR 97204) for Appellant Clint Fisher. Date of service: 04/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11659307] [20-35310] (Anderson-Dana, Lydia) [Entered: 04/13/2020 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11659071]. [20-35310] (AD) [Entered: 04/13/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clint Fisher Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/13/2020. [11658437] [20-35310] (Berne, Cody) [Entered: 04/13/2020 08:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Clint Fisher Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/13/2020. Appellant Clint Fisher opening brief due 06/02/2020. Appellees Brian Dodge, Donovan Duncan, Lee Egland, Robert Estrada, Matt Hainley, Peter Hart, Gail Mccormick, Patrick Murphy, Alice Ng, Mike O'Connor, Robert Reller, Marina Secchitano, John Skow and Adam Smith answering brief due 07/02/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11652282] (JPD) [Entered: 04/06/2020 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steve D. Larson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lydia Anderson-Dana