This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2021 at 06:07:56 (UTC).

Clayton Salter v. Quality Carriers, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Clayton Salter filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Quality Carriers, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55593

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

QUALITY CARRIERS, INC., an Illinois Corporation

QUALITY DISTRIBUTION, INC., a Florida Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

CLAYTON SALTER, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher James Eckhart

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary, P.C.

10 West Market Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Christopher Chad McNatt Jr.

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary, LLP

2 North Lake Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101

Elizabeth Ashley Paynter Esquire

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary, P.C.

10 West Market Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer D. Bennett

Attorney at Gupta Wessler

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Taras Kick

Attorney at The Kick Law Firm

815 Moraga Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Matthew W.H. Wessler

Attorney at Gupta Wessler, PLLC

2001 K Street, Nw, Suite 850 N

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel Joseph Bass Esquire

Attorney at MAKAREM & ASSOCIATES, APLC

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2440

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

2 #3

Mediation Letter

2 #4

Case Opening Packet

#3

#4

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/05/2021, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled 12:00 p.m.). [12179959] (VS) [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/05/2021, 12:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12179897] (VS) [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 07/21/2021, 09:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 10:00 a.m.). [12174873] (VS) [Entered: 07/16/2021 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/21/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12165077] (BLS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/25/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12154679]. [21-55593] (AD) [Entered: 06/25/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clayton Salter Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/25/2021. [12154107] [21-55593] (Bennett, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/25/2021 07:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12153470] (LW) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 06/17/2021. [12147776] (BY) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clayton Salter Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [leave to file mediation questionnaire three days after deadline]. Date of service: 06/17/2021. [12147164] [21-55593] (Bennett, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/17/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Clayton Salter Correspondence: Appellant's notice regarding transcripts. Date of service: 06/10/2021 [12141131] [21-55593] (Bennett, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Clayton Salter Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/14/2021. Transcript ordered by 07/07/2021. Transcript due 08/06/2021. Appellant Clayton Salter opening brief due 09/15/2021. Appellees Quality Carriers, Inc. and Quality Distribution, Inc. answering brief due 10/15/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12135776] (HH) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) in Case No. 21-80038 on June 7, 2021: Petitioners motion for leave to file a reply (Docket Entry No. 3) is granted. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district courts April 9, 2021 order denying class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). [12135773] (HH) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QAULITY DISTRIBUTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W.H. Wessler