This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2019 at 06:04:16 (UTC).

Claudio Rojas v. Field Office Director, Miami, et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Claudio Rojas filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Field Office Director, Miami. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11107

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ASSISTANT FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, MIAMI FIELD OFFICE, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Liana J. Castano

FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, MIAMI FIELD OFFICE, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Marc J. Moore

ASSISTANT FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, MIAMI FIELD OFFICE, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Mitchell Diaz

SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY, Kirstjen Nielsen

OFFICER IN CHARGE, KROME SERVICE PROCESSING CENTER, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Juan Acosta

Plaintiff / Appellant

CLAUDIO MARCELO ROJAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Dexter Alan Lee

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Rebecca Sharpless

Attorney at University of Miami School of Law

1311 Miller Dr

Coral Gables, FL 33146-2300

Sandy R. Pineda

Attorney at Angel F. Leal, Jr., PA

8700 W Flagler St Ste 402

Miami, FL 33174

Francisco Javier Lopez Jr.

Attorney at Angel F. Leal, Jr., PA

8700 W Flagler St Ste 402

Miami, FL 33174

Jose Carlos de Wit

Attorney at De Wit Immigration Law, PA

829 4Th St Ste 2

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Jessica L. Rofe

Attorney at Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.

245 Sullivan St 5Th Fl

New York, NY 10012

Alina Das

Attorney at Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.

245 Sullivan St 5Th Fl

New York, NY 10012

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Alina Das is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8733793-2 ] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Jessica L. Rofe is GRANTED by clerk. [8733806-2] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Alina Das for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. [8733793-1] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #4

Error

Open Restricted Document #3

MOT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Restricted Document #2

Attachment

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction.; Motion for stay of removal filed by Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas is DENIED as MOOT. [ # 8729854-2 ] CRW, WHP and RSR [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Alina Das is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8733793-2 ] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Jessica L. Rofe is GRANTED by clerk. [8733806-2] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Jessica L. Rofe for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. [8733806-1] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Alina Das for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. [8733793-1] [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jose Carlos de Wit for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11107] (ECF: Jose de Wit) [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. [19-11107] (ECF: Jose de Wit) [Entered: 03/29/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of forthcoming opposition to Appellant's response to motion to stay filed by Attorney Jose Carlos de Wit for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. [19-11107] (ECF: Jose de Wit) [Entered: 03/28/2019 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Emily M. Smachetti for Appellees Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Officer in Charge, Krome Service Processing Center, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary of Homeland Security. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11107] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas [ # 8729854-2 ] filed by Attorney Emily M. Smachetti for Appellees Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Officer in Charge, Krome Service Processing Center, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary of Homeland Security. [19-11107] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dexter Lee for Appellee [19-11107] (ECF: Dexter Lee) [Entered: 03/28/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jose Carlos de Wit for Claudio Marcelo Rojas [19-11107] (ECF: Jose de Wit) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA Emily M. Smachetti for Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Officer in Charge, Krome Service Processing Center, Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Secretary of Homeland Security. [19-11107] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Sandy R. Pineda for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas in 19-11107. [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Jose Carlos de Wit for Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas in 19-11107. [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EMERGENCY MOTION for stay of removal filed by Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8729854-1] --[Edited 03/28/2019 by GMP] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Appellate fee was paid on 03/27/2019 as to Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas on 03/26/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/10/2019 as to Appellant Claudio Marcelo Rojas. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/24/2019 as to Appellee Assistant Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement--[Edited 03/27/2019 by GMP] [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.