This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

Clark v. Braggs

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Clark filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Braggs. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6105

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

HERMAN TRACY CLARK

Lexington, OK 73051-0260

Respondent / Appellee

JEROLD BRAGGS, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Herman Tracy Clark

Attorney at Lexington Assessment & Reception Center

P.O. Box 260

Lexington, OK 73051-0260

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10674089] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance past due. Notice of appearance now due on 09/09/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark [19-6105] [Entered: 08/28/2019 09:36 AM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10664033] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellant to show cause in writing why the filing restrictions in In re Clark, 13-6053 do not apply to this proceeding. Response due on 08/08/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark. Briefing on the merits is tolled; however, current due dates remain in place. Served on 07/18/2019. [19-6105] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:43 AM]

Open Document

[10668814] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or IFP forms and appellant's combined opening brief and application for certificate of appealability due 09/16/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 08/27/2019. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

[10668214] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:04 PM]

Open Document

[10668810] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the issue raised in the 07/18/2019 order [ # 10664033-2 ] and discussed in appellant's response [ # 10668203-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 08/06/2019. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:32 PM]

Open Document

[10677382] Entry of appearance filed by Herman Tracy Clark. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-6105] [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:06 PM]

Open Document

[10668826] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Volume I - Pleadings. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:05 PM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

[10668203] Show cause motion filed by Mr. Herman Tracy Clark in response to order to show cause. Served on 07/29/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:59 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10677382] Entry of appearance filed by Herman Tracy Clark. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-6105] [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10674089] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance past due. Notice of appearance now due on 09/09/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark [19-6105] [Entered: 08/28/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668826] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Volume I - Pleadings. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668814] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or IFP forms and appellant's combined opening brief and application for certificate of appealability due 09/16/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 08/27/2019. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668810] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the issue raised in the 07/18/2019 order [ # 10664033-2 ] and discussed in appellant's response [ # 10668203-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 08/06/2019. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668214] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668203] Show cause motion filed by Mr. Herman Tracy Clark in response to order to show cause. Served on 07/29/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6105] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664033] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellant to show cause in writing why the filing restrictions in In re Clark, 13-6053 do not apply to this proceeding. Response due on 08/08/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark. Briefing on the merits is tolled; however, current due dates remain in place. Served on 07/18/2019. [19-6105] [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663398] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2019. Fee or IFP forms due in district court 08/15/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark. Notice of appearance due on 08/15/2019 for Herman Tracy Clark. [19-6105] [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.