This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:06:51 (UTC).

Clarendon National Ins. Co. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Clarendon National Ins Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1212

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellee

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John William Dennehy

127 Main St

Nashua, NH 03060-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David W. Zizik

Attorney at Sulloway & Hollis PLLC

40 Westminster St, Ste 201

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1212] (DWZ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:37 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:43 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for docketing statement [ # 6242305-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Brief and Appendix due 06/05/2019 for appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. [19-1212] (GB) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:13 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix [ # 6242620-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:51 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Attorney David W. Zizik. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1212] (DWZ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:33 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6242304-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 04/10/2019. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:26 AM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:45 AM]

Open Document

ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1212] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JWD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [ # 6242306-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:22 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Brief and Appendix due 06/05/2019 for appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. [19-1212] (GB) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE of service for motion to extend time to file brief and/or appendix [ # 6242620-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1212] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JWD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 05/06/2019 for appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE of service for transcript report/order form [ # 6242306-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE of service for docketing statement [ # 6242305-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6242304-2 ] filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company filed by Attorney John W. Dennehy. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1212] (JWD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 04/10/2019. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1212] (DWZ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by Attorney David W. Zizik. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1212] (DWZ) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #36) filed by Appellant Clarendon National Insurance Company. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/26/2019. [19-1212] (GRC) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less