This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 06:04:05 (UTC).

Clarence Reynolds v. State of Virginia

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Clarence Reynolds filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6311

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

TERRY MCAULIFFE, Former Governor; State of Virginia

GOVERNOR

PAROLE BOARD MEMBERS

Defendant / Appellees

RALPH S. NORTHAM, Governor, State of Virginia

REVERAND A. LINCOLN JAMES, Member of Parole Board

JEAN CUNNINGHAM, Member of Parole Board

JONI L. IVEY, Member of Parole Board

THE SENATE AND HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVE OF VIRGINIA

STATE OF VIRGINIA

ADRIANNE BENNETT, Chairwoman of Parole Board

SHERMAN P. LEA, Member of Parole Board

Plaintiff / Appellant

CLARENCE DUKE REYNOLDS

Dillwyn, VA 23936-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Carson Vorhis

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Laura Haeberle Cahill

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Charisse Mullen

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Clarence Duke Reynolds

Attorney at BUCKINGHAM CORRECTIONAL CENTER

P. O. Box 430

Dillwyn, VA 23936-0000

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Clarence Reynolds. Informal Opening Brief due 03/28/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:09 PM]

#6

(#6) Letter re: requesting forms for appeal [ # 1 ] case by Clarence Duke Reynolds . [1000471271] [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:58 PM]

#3

(#3) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Clarence Duke Reynolds ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Clarence Reynolds. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:00 PM]

#7

(#7) MOTION by Clarence Duke Reynolds to appoint/assign counsel.. Date and method of service: 03/15/2019 US mail. [1000479801] [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:23 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER filed [1000479820] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [8] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Clarence Duke Reynolds, 1174999. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Clarence Reynolds. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:32 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:17-cv-00517-JLK-JCH. Case manager: JMoore. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:11 PM]

#9

(#9) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Clarence Duke Reynolds. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:25 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER filed [1000479820] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [8] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Clarence Duke Reynolds, 1174999. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Clarence Reynolds. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Clarence Duke Reynolds. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#8) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Clarence Duke Reynolds. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Clarence Duke Reynolds to appoint/assign counsel.. Date and method of service: 03/15/2019 US mail. [1000479801] [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/21/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter re: requesting forms for appeal [ # 1 ] case by Clarence Duke Reynolds . [1000471271] [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Clarence Reynolds. Informal Opening Brief due 03/28/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Clarence Duke Reynolds ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Clarence Reynolds. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • (#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:17-cv-00517-JLK-JCH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:17-cv-00517-JLK-JCH. Case manager: JMoore. [19-6311] JHM [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.