This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2020 at 06:09:03 (UTC).

CityPlace Retail, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 CityPlace Retail, LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank N A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11748

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CITYPLACE RETAIL, LLC, A Foreign Limited Liability Company

Defendant / Appellees

CSMC 2007-C1 SOUTH ROSEMARY, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-C1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Karen A. Chesley

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Robert George Keefe

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Bruce Alan Weil

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Nicholas A. Gravante

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Patricia Melville

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Laselve Elijah Harrison

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

Stephen Neal Zack

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33131

David A. Barrett

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Paul Woodbury

Attorney at Woodbury Santiago & Correoso, PA

9100 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1702

Miami, FL 33156-7809

H. Peter Haveles Jr.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter, LLP

399 Park Ave Fl 34

New York, NY 10022-4614

Angelo A. Sito III

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton, LLP

620 8Th Ave 37Th Fl

New York, NY 10018-1405

Angelo Anthony Stio III

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton, LLP

301 Carnegie Ctr Ste 400

Princeton, NJ 08648

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Angelo Anthony Stio, III is GRANTED by clerk. [9125020-2] [Entered: 06/30/2020 11:17 AM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to amend document filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 06/24/2020 05:26 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 06/24/2020 05:06 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to amend document filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Motion is Unopposed. [9120867-1] [20-11748] (ECF: Michael Woodbury) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:17 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A. [20-11748] (ECF: Michael Woodbury) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:02 PM]

Open Document #2

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document #1

MOT-11 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC is GRANTED. [ # 9106789-2 ] Appellants brief due on 07/31/2020. CRW [Entered: 06/15/2020 02:25 PM]

Open Document

Corrected RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [ # 9106789-2 ] filed by Attorney Michael Paul Woodbury for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. [20-11748] Added "corrected" to docket text--[Edited 06/12/2020 by TLR] (ECF: Michael Woodbury) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David A. Barrett for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karen Chesley for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC Karen A. Chesley for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laselve Harrison for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC Laselve Elijah Harrison for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicholas A. Gravante for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen N. Zack for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:00 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Karen A. Chesley for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Nicholas A. Gravante for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Laselve Elijah Harrison for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Robert George Keefe for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Patricia Melville for CityPlace Retail, LLC and Bruce Alan Weil for CityPlace Retail, LLC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:41 AM]

Open Document #3

DE #229 Final Judgment

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Angelo Anthony Stio, III is GRANTED by clerk. [9125020-2] [Entered: 06/30/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Angelo Anthony Stio, III for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. [9125020-1] [Entered: 06/30/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to amend document filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 06/24/2020 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 06/24/2020 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to amend document filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Motion is Unopposed. [9120867-1] [20-11748] (ECF: Michael Woodbury) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A. [20-11748] (ECF: Michael Woodbury) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Receipt/No action taken as to: Appearance of Counsel filed by Nicholas A. Gravante for CityPlace Retail, LLC, because counsel has not filed an application for admission. [Entered: 06/24/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC is GRANTED. [ # 9106789-2 ] Appellants brief due on 07/31/2020. CRW [Entered: 06/15/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrected RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [ # 9106789-2 ] filed by Attorney Michael Paul Woodbury for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. [20-11748] Added "corrected" to docket text--[Edited 06/12/2020 by TLR] (ECF: Michael Woodbury) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Motion for extension to file appellant brief [ # 9106789-2 ] filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 06/10/2020 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Stephen Neal Zack for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Stephen N. Zack for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bruce Alan Weil for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David A. Barrett for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Karen Chesley for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC Karen A. Chesley for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laselve Harrison for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC Laselve Elijah Harrison for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicholas A. Gravante for CityPlace Retail, LLC. [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen N. Zack for Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC [20-11748] (ECF: Stephen Zack) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Karen A. Chesley for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Nicholas A. Gravante for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Laselve Elijah Harrison for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Robert George Keefe for CityPlace Retail, LLC, Patricia Melville for CityPlace Retail, LLC and Bruce Alan Weil for CityPlace Retail, LLC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC on 05/07/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/21/2020 as to Appellant CityPlace Retail, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/04/2020 as to Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A. [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CityPlace Retail, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Paul Woodbury