This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/20/2021 at 06:04:05 (UTC).

City of Taylor, TN, et al v. Astec Industries, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 City of Taylor, TN filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Astec Industries, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5602

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF TAYLOR, TN, GENERAL EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated

Defendant / Appellees

DAVID C. SILVIOUS

ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

BENJAMIN G. BROCK

MALCOLM SWANSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

LYNN JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John A. Jordak Jr.

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 W. Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Elizabeth Gingold Clark

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 W. Peachtree Street, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

John G. Jackson

Attorney at Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel

605 Chestnut Street, Suite 1700

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Courtney Quiros

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 W. Peachtree Street, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Phillip Kim

Attorney at Law Office

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Paul Kent Bramlett

Attorney at Bramlett Law Offices

P.O. Box 150734

Nashville, TN 37215

Daniel I. Tyre-Karp

Attorney at Law Office

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#22) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 08/17/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Phillip Kim for Mr. Lynn Johnson. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-5602] (PK) [Entered: 08/16/2021 11:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson by PAUL KENT BRAMLETT. Certificate of Service: 07/07/2021. [21-5602] (PKB) [Entered: 07/07/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED DUE TO INCORRECT FORMAT. COUNSEL ADVISED TO PRINT FORM AS PDF AND THEN UPLOAD TO DOCKET SO FORM IS NOT EDITABLE.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson by PAUL KENT BRAMLETT. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-5602]--[Edited 07/07/2021 by JAS] (PKB) [Entered: 07/06/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/16/2021;. appellee brief due 09/14/2021; (JAS) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson by Phillip Kim. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-5602] (PK) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#16) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Daniel I. Tyre-Karp for Mr. Lynn Johnson. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-5602] (DIT) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel I. Tyre-Karp for Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-5602] (DIT) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel I. Tyre-Karp for Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson.. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-5602] (DIT) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson by Daniel Tyre-Karp. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2021. [21-5602] (DIT) [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Astec Industries, Inc., Benjamin G. Brock, David C. Silvious and Malcolm Swanson by Elizabeth Gingold Clark. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2021. [21-5602] (EGC) [Entered: 06/25/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Astec Industries, Inc., Benjamin G. Brock, David C. Silvious and Malcolm Swanson by John A. Jordak, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2021. [21-5602] (JAJ) [Entered: 06/25/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED: DOCUMENT NOT IN CORRECT FORMAT. COUNSEL ADVISED TO PRINT AS PDF AND THEN UPLOAD FORM SO IT IS NOT EDITABLE.***APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Astec Industries, Inc., Benjamin G. Brock, David C. Silvious and Malcolm Swanson by Courtney E. Quiros. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2021. [21-5602]--[Edited 06/25/2021 by JAS] (CQ) [Entered: 06/25/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED: DOCUMENT NOT IN CORRECT FORMAT. COUNSEL ADVISED TO PRINT AS PDF AND THEN UPLOAD FORM SO IT IS NOT EDITABLE.***APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Astec Industries, Inc., Benjamin G. Brock, David C. Silvious and Malcolm Swanson by Elizabeth Gingold Clark. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2021. [21-5602]--[Edited 06/25/2021 by JAS] (EGC) [Entered: 06/25/2021 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John A. Jordak, Jr. for Appellees Astec Industries, Inc., Benjamin G. Brock, David C. Silvious and Malcolm Swanson Certificate of Service: 06/25/2021. [21-5602] (JAJ) [Entered: 06/25/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED: DOCUMENT NOT IN CORRECT FORMAT. COUNSEL ADVISED TO PRINT AS PDF AND THEN UPLOAD FORM SO IT IS NOT EDITABLE.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Astec Industries, Inc., Benjamin G. Brock, David C. Silvious, Malcolm Swanson by John A. Jordak, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2021. [21-5602] (JAJ) [Entered: 06/25/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 06/22/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 06/22/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Strobel (JAS) [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Lynn Johnson. Transcript needed: y. (JAS) [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTEC INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Kent Bramlett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Kim