This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/03/2022 at 10:30:37 (UTC).

City of Rome, Georgia, et al v. Hotels.Com, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 City of Rome, Georgia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hotels Com, L P . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10034

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA

HART COUNTY

CITY OF CARTERSVILLE, GEORGIA, And All Others Similarly Situated

FULTON COUNTY

CITY OF HARTWELL

CITY OF ROCKMART

CITY OF CEDARTOWN

CITY OF DALTON

Intervenor / Appellees

IAC/INTERACTIVECORP

COMMISSIONER, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Defendant / Appellees

HOTELS.COM, L.P.

HOTWIRE, INC.

TRIP NETWORK, INC., d.b.a. Cheaptickets.com

TRAVELPORT, INC., f.k.a. Cendent Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc.

EXPEDIA, INC.

INTERNETWORK PUBLISHING CORP., d.b.a. Lodging.Com

LOWEST FARE.COM, INC.

MAUPINTOUR HOLDING, LLC

ORBITZ, INC.

ORBITZ, LLC

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert M. Brinson

Attorney at Brinson Askew Berry Seigler Richardson & Davis, LLP

Po Box 5007

Rome, GA 30162-5007

John W. Crongeyer

Attorney at Crongeyer Law Firm, PC

2170 Defoor Hills

Atlanta, GA 30318

David William Davenport

Attorney at Lamar Archer & Cofrin, LLP

260 Peachtree St Nw Ste 2700

Atlanta, GA 30303

J. Anderson Davis

Attorney at Brinson Askew Berry Seigler Richardson & Davis, LLP

Po Box 5007

Rome, GA 30162-5007

David Gordon Archer Sr.

Attorney at Archer & Lovell, PC

102 Leake St, Po Box 1024

Cartersville, GA 30120

Walter James Gordon

Attorney at The Gordon Law Firm

415 E Howell St

Hartwell, GA 30643

Robert C. Lamar

Attorney at Lamar Archer & Cofrin, LLP

260 Peachtree St Nw Ste 2700

Atlanta, GA 30303

John T. Murray

Attorney at Murray & Murray

111 E Shoreline Dr

Sandusky, OH 44870

Kevin A. Ross

Attorney at The Law Practice of Kevin A. Ross, LLC

2255 Cumberland Pkwy Ste B

Atlanta, GA 30339

Bryan A. Vroon

Attorney at Law Offices of Bryan A. Vroon LLC

1766 West Paces Ferry Rd

Atlanta, GA 30327

Intervenor / Appellee and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward Hine Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Edward Hine, Jr., PC

111 Bridgepoint Plaza Ste 300

Rome, GA 30161

F. Carlton King Jr.

Attorney at King & Croft, LLP

127 Peachtree St Ne Ste 707

Atlanta, GA 30303-1800

Warren R. Calvert

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Michele Maria Young

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Clark R. Calhoun

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Lucas Wade Andrews

Attorney at Poole Huffman, LLC

3562 Habersham At Northlake Bldg J Ste 200

Tucker, GA 30084

Sean P. Costello

Attorney at Jones Day

1221 Peachtree St Ne Ste 400

Atlanta, GA 30309

James P. Karen

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood St Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Alan F. Pryor

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Deborah S. Sloan

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood St Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Pursuant to Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 01/31/2022 11:49 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. Motion is Unopposed. [9586511-1] [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/31/2022 10:33 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file a Civil Appeal Statement form to 01/28/2022, for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. Motion is Unopposed. [9585812-1] [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:40 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:53 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:50 PM]

Open Document

Returned Mail was received for Attorney John D. Pernick for Appellee Maupintour Holding, LLC. IN RE: Docketing Letter. [Entered: 01/28/2022 12:57 PM]

Open Document

Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants Fulton County, City of Rome, Georgia, Hart County, City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Hartwell, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton and City of Rockmart has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 01/25/2022 05:33 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Baird Carpenter for Agoda International, USA, LLC, Egencia, LLC, EXPE, Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com, Inc., Rocket Travel, Inc. and Travelscape, LLC. [22-10034] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:46 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clark R. Calhoun for Agoda International, USA, LLC, Egencia, LLC, EXPE, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com, Inc., Rocket Travel, Inc. and Travelscape, LLC. [22-10034] (ECF: Clark Calhoun) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alan F. Pryor for Agoda International, USA, LLC, Egencia, LLC, EXPE, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com, Inc., Rocket Travel, Inc. and Travelscape, LLC. [22-10034] (ECF: Alan Pryor) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:41 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/14/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/18/2022 09:00 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/13/2022 03:05 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Anderson Davis for City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/13/2022 03:03 PM]

Open Document #4

DE #810 Order

Open Document #3

DE #805 Order

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Pursuant to Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 01/31/2022 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants Fulton County, City of Rome, Georgia, Hart County, City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Hartwell, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton and City of Rockmart is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9586511-2 ]; Motion for extension of time to file civil appeal statement form is MOOT [ # 9585812-2 ]; Motion for Leave to File Out of Time is MOOT [ # 9585812-3 ] [Entered: 01/31/2022 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. Motion is Unopposed. [9586511-1] [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/31/2022 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file a Civil Appeal Statement form to 01/28/2022, for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. Motion is Unopposed. [9585812-1] [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail was received for Attorney John D. Pernick for Appellee Maupintour Holding, LLC. IN RE: Docketing Letter. [Entered: 01/28/2022 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants Fulton County, City of Rome, Georgia, Hart County, City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Hartwell, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton and City of Rockmart has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 01/25/2022 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to J. Anderson Davis for Fulton County, City of Rome, Georgia, Hart County, City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Hartwell, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton and City of Rockmart. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 01/19/2022 05:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Baird Carpenter for Agoda International, USA, LLC, Egencia, LLC, EXPE, Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com, Inc., Rocket Travel, Inc. and Travelscape, LLC. [22-10034] (ECF: David Carpenter) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clark R. Calhoun for Agoda International, USA, LLC, Egencia, LLC, EXPE, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com, Inc., Rocket Travel, Inc. and Travelscape, LLC. [22-10034] (ECF: Clark Calhoun) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alan F. Pryor for Agoda International, USA, LLC, Egencia, LLC, EXPE, Hotels.Com, L.P., Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.Com, Inc., Rocket Travel, Inc. and Travelscape, LLC. [22-10034] (ECF: Alan Pryor) [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/14/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/18/2022 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney J. Anderson Davis for Appellants City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/13/2022 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Anderson Davis for City of Cartersville, Georgia, City of Cedartown, City of Dalton, City of Hartwell, City of Rockmart, City of Rome, Georgia, Fulton County and Hart County. [22-10034] (ECF: J. Davis) [Entered: 01/13/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant City of Cartersville, Georgia on 12/30/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/18/2022 as to Appellant City of Cartersville, Georgia. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/31/2022 as to Appellee Agoda International, USA, LLC [Entered: 01/10/2022 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELPORT, INC., f.k.a. Cendent Travel Distribution Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trip Network, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hotwire, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ORBITZ is a litigant