This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/12/2021 at 06:23:00 (UTC).

City of Minnetonka v. Stella-Jones Corp.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 City of Minnetonka filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Stella-Jones Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3292

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

 

Party Details

Defendants

Koppers, Inc.

Ruetgers Canada, Inc.

Rain Carbon Holdings, LLC

Rain Carbon, Inc.

Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation

Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC

Beazer East

Stella-Jones, Inc.

Bonsal American, Inc.

Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.

Vance Brothers, Inc.

The Brewer Company

Plaintiff / Appellee

City of Minnetonka, Minnesota

Defendant / Appellant

Stella-Jones Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Craig A. Buske

Attorney at SHULMAN & BUSKE

126 N. Third Street

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Nancy Christensen

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG

5Th Floor, 700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Robin Lynn Greenwald

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG

5Th Floor, 700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Carolyn Glass Anderson

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN & REED

1100 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4123

Diana Gjonaj

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG

24Th Floor, 3011 W. Grand Boulevard

Detroit, MI 48202

June Pineda Hoidal

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN & REED

1100 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4123

Julia Kathryn Muench

Attorney at SUPER LAW GROUP, LLC

Third Floor, 110 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Carl Richard Hansen

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN & REED

1100 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4123

Edan Rotenberg

Attorney at SUPER LAW GROUP, LLC

Third Floor, 110 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John K. Sherk III

Attorney at SHOOK & HARDY

Suite 2300, 555 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Mark D. Anstoetter

Attorney at SHOOK & HARDY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

David Brent Dwerlkotte

Attorney at SHOOK & HARDY

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Christopher William Madel

Attorney at MADEL PA

Suite 800, 800 Hennepin Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55403

Matthew J.M. Pelikan

Attorney at ROBINS & KAPLAN

2800 Lasalle Plaza, 800 Lasalle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Jennifer M. Robbins

Attorney at MADEL PA

800 Hennepin Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55403

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Edan Rotenberg for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/23/2021 [5101014] [21-3292] (JKM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 12:58 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Julia Muench for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/23/2021 [5100871] [21-3292] (JKM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:45 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Julia Muench for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/23/2021 [5100790] [21-3292] --[Edited 11/24/2021 by CRJ. APP FORM HAS BEEN REFILED WITH CORRECT PARTY DESIGNATION, SEE HISTORY# 5100871.] (JKM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:37 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Carolyn G. Anderson for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/08/2021 [5095460] [21-3292] (CGA) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:56 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by June P. Hoidal for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/05/2021 [5095057] [21-3292] (JPH) [Entered: 11/05/2021 06:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Robin Greenwald for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 10/28/2021 [5092132] [21-3292] (RLG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 04:37 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Nancy Christensen for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 10/28/2021 [5092044] [21-3292] (NC) [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Diana Gjonaj for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 10/28/2021 [5092006] [21-3292] (DG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:01 PM]

Open Document

Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellants City of Maple Grove, City of Bloomington, City of Minnetonka, City of Apple Valley, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of White Bear Lake and City of Saint Cloud in 21-3177, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of White Bear Lake in 21-3179, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Eagan in 21-3181, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Golden Valley in 21-3182, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Apple Valley in 21-3183, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Maple Grove in 21-3185, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Eden Prairie in 21-3186, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Saint Cloud in 21-3187, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Bloomington in 21-3191, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Minnetonka in 21-3193, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3194, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellees City of Maple Grove, City of Bloomington, City of Minnetonka, City of Apple Valley, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of White Bear Lake and City of Saint Cloud in 21-3287, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Minnetonka in 21-3292, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3300, 21-3302, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Eden Prairie in 21-3303, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Saint Cloud in 21-3304, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of White Bear Lake in 21-3305, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Apple Valley in 21-3307, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Golden Valley in 21-3308, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Eagan in 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Bloomington in 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Maple Grove in 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326. New electronic copy of addendum due on 12/14/2021 [5106226] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3305, 21-3311, 21-3181, 21-3309, 21-3312, 21-3182, 21-3308, 21-3315, 21-3183, 21-3307, 21-3316, 21-3185, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3186, 21-3303, 21-3320, 21-3187, 21-3304, 21-3323, 21-3191, 21-3313, 21-3324, 21-3193, 21-3292, 21-3325, 21-3194, 21-3300, 21-3326, 21-3287, 21-3302] (CRJ) [Entered: 12/09/2021 09:58 AM]

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellants City of Maple Grove, City of Bloomington, City of Minnetonka, City of Apple Valley, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of White Bear Lake and City of Saint Cloud in 21-3177. [5106217] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3305, 21-3311, 21-3181, 21-3309, 21-3312, 21-3182, 21-3308, 21-3315, 21-3183, 21-3307, 21-3316, 21-3185, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3186, 21-3303, 21-3320, 21-3187, 21-3304, 21-3323, 21-3191, 21-3313, 21-3324, 21-3193, 21-3292, 21-3325, 21-3194, 21-3300, 21-3326, 21-3287, 21-3302] (CRJ) [Entered: 12/09/2021 09:44 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellee Beazer East in 21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, Appellant Beazer East in 21-3302, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326 - w/service 11/01/2021. [5092787] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3302, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308, 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326] (MCM) [Entered: 11/01/2021 01:36 PM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellants City of Maple Grove, City of Bloomington, City of Minnetonka, City of Apple Valley, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of White Bear Lake and City of Saint Cloud in 21-3177, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of White Bear Lake in 21-3179, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Eagan in 21-3181, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Golden Valley in 21-3182, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Apple Valley in 21-3183, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Maple Grove in 21-3185, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Eden Prairie in 21-3186, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Saint Cloud in 21-3187, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Bloomington in 21-3191, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Minnetonka in 21-3193, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellant City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3194, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellees City of Maple Grove, City of Bloomington, City of Minnetonka, City of Apple Valley, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of White Bear Lake and City of Saint Cloud in 21-3287, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Minnetonka in 21-3292, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3300, 21-3302, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Eden Prairie in 21-3303, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Saint Cloud in 21-3304, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of White Bear Lake in 21-3305, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Apple Valley in 21-3307, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Golden Valley in 21-3308, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Eagan in 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Bloomington in 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellee City of Maple Grove in 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326. New electronic copy of addendum due on 12/14/2021 [5106226] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3305, 21-3311, 21-3181, 21-3309, 21-3312, 21-3182, 21-3308, 21-3315, 21-3183, 21-3307, 21-3316, 21-3185, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3186, 21-3303, 21-3320, 21-3187, 21-3304, 21-3323, 21-3191, 21-3313, 21-3324, 21-3193, 21-3292, 21-3325, 21-3194, 21-3300, 21-3326, 21-3287, 21-3302] (CRJ) [Entered: 12/09/2021 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Julia Kathryn Muench for Appellants City of Maple Grove, City of Bloomington, City of Minnetonka, City of Apple Valley, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of White Bear Lake and City of Saint Cloud in 21-3177. [5106217] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3305, 21-3311, 21-3181, 21-3309, 21-3312, 21-3182, 21-3308, 21-3315, 21-3183, 21-3307, 21-3316, 21-3185, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3186, 21-3303, 21-3320, 21-3187, 21-3304, 21-3323, 21-3191, 21-3313, 21-3324, 21-3193, 21-3292, 21-3325, 21-3194, 21-3300, 21-3326, 21-3287, 21-3302] (CRJ) [Entered: 12/09/2021 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of Saint Cloud and City of White Bear Lake in 21-3177, City of White Bear Lake in 21-3179, City of Eagan in 21-3181, City of Golden Valley in 21-3182, City of Apple Valley in 21-3183, City of Maple Grove in 21-3185, City of Eden Prairie in 21-3186, City of Saint Cloud in 21-3187, City of Bloomington in 21-3191, City of Minnetonka in 21-3193, City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3194. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5105702] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3302, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308, 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326] (JKM) [Entered: 12/07/2021 11:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of Saint Cloud and City of White Bear Lake in 21-3177, City of White Bear Lake in 21-3179, City of Eagan in 21-3181, City of Golden Valley in 21-3182, City of Apple Valley in 21-3183, City of Maple Grove in 21-3185, City of Eden Prairie in 21-3186, City of Saint Cloud in 21-3187, City of Bloomington in 21-3191, City of Minnetonka in 21-3193, City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3194 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5105701] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3302, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308, 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326] (JKM) [Entered: 12/07/2021 11:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Edan Rotenberg for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/23/2021 [5101014] [21-3292] (JKM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Julia Muench for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/23/2021 [5100871] [21-3292] (JKM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Julia Muench for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/23/2021 [5100790] [21-3292] --[Edited 11/24/2021 by CRJ. APP FORM HAS BEEN REFILED WITH CORRECT PARTY DESIGNATION, SEE HISTORY# 5100871.] (JKM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Julia Muench for Not Party Beazer East w/service 11/22/2021 [5100531] [21-3292] --[Edited 11/24/2021 by CRJ. APP FORM HAS BEEN REFILED WITH CORRECT PARTY DESIGNATION, SEE HISTORY# 5100871.] (JKM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Carolyn G. Anderson for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/08/2021 [5095460] [21-3292] (CGA) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by June P. Hoidal for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 11/05/2021 [5095057] [21-3292] (JPH) [Entered: 11/05/2021 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Beazer East in 21-3302, Appellee Beazer East in 21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326 - w/service 11/01/2021. [5092789] [21-3302, 21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308, 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326] (MCM) [Entered: 11/01/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellee Beazer East in 21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, Appellant Beazer East in 21-3302, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326 - w/service 11/01/2021. [5092787] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3302, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308, 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326] (MCM) [Entered: 11/01/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Robin Greenwald for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 10/28/2021 [5092132] [21-3292] (RLG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Nancy Christensen for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 10/28/2021 [5092044] [21-3292] (NC) [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Diana Gjonaj for Appellee City of Minnetonka w/service 10/28/2021 [5092006] [21-3292] (DG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation in 21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194. - FOR CAL [5088397] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3302, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308, 21-3309, 21-3311, 21-3312, 21-3313, 21-3315, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3320, 21-3323, 21-3324, 21-3325, 21-3326] (AWD) [Entered: 10/18/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/29/2021. Appendix due 12/07/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of Saint Cloud and City of White Bear Lake due 12/07/2021. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [5088144] [21-3177, 21-3305, 21-3311, 21-3309, 21-3312, 21-3308, 21-3315, 21-3307, 21-3316, 21-3317, 21-3318, 21-3303, 21-3320, 21-3304, 21-3323, 21-3313, 21-3324, 21-3292, 21-3325, 21-3300, 21-3326, 21-3287, 21-3302] (CBO) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of Saint Cloud and City of White Bear Lake in 21-3177, Appellant City of White Bear Lake in 21-3179, Appellant City of Eagan in 21-3181, Appellant City of Golden Valley in 21-3182, Appellant City of Apple Valley in 21-3183, Appellant City of Maple Grove in 21-3185, Appellant City of Eden Prairie in 21-3186, Appellant City of Saint Cloud in 21-3187, Appellant City of Bloomington in 21-3191, Appellant City of Minnetonka in 21-3193, Appellant City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3194, Appellees City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, City of Burnsville, City of Eagan, City of Eden Prairie, City of Golden Valley, City of Inver Grove Heights, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of Saint Cloud and City of White Bear Lake in 21-3287, Appellee City of Minnetonka in 21-3292, Appellee City of Inver Grove Heights in 21-3300, 21-3302, Appellee City of Eden Prairie in 21-3303, Appellee City of Saint Cloud in 21-3304, Appellee City of White Bear Lake in 21-3305, Appellee City of Apple Valley in 21-3307, Appellee City of Golden Valley in 21-3308 - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/14/2021 [5087298] [21-3177, 21-3179, 21-3181, 21-3182, 21-3183, 21-3185, 21-3186, 21-3187, 21-3191, 21-3193, 21-3194, 21-3287, 21-3292, 21-3300, 21-3302, 21-3303, 21-3304, 21-3305, 21-3307, 21-3308] (ER) [Entered: 10/14/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 8/27/21 [5086723] [21-3292] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5086713] [21-3292] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Specialty Technology and Research, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vance Brothers, Inc. is a litigant