This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/03/2022 at 06:22:08 (UTC).

City of Huntington, West Virginia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 City of Huntington, West Virginia filed an Other lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1819

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CITY OF HUNTINGTON, WEST VIRGINIA

Defendant / Appellees

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION

CARDINAL HEALTH, INCORPORATED

MCKESSON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David Ira Ackerman

401 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Donald Arbitblit

275 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Andrew P. Arnold

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Andrea Bierstein

112 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016-7416

Louis M. Bograd Esq.

Attorney at MOTLEY RICE LLC

401 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

David D. Burnett

401 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Mark A. Colantonio

1609 Warwood Avenue

Wheeling, WV 26003-0000

Michael Edward Elsner

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Clayton John Fitzsimmons

1609 Warwood Avenue

Wheeling, WV 26003-0000

Robert Patrick Fitzsimmons

1609 Warwood Avenue

Wheeling, WV 26003-0000

Alison S. Gaffney

1201 3Rd Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Dean Noburu Kawamoto

1201 3Rd Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

David J. Ko

1201 3Rd Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Annie E. Kouba

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Derek W. Loeser

1201 3Rd Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Anthony J. Majestro

405 Capitol Street, P. O. Box 3081

Charleston, WV 25331-0000

Christopher F. Moriarty

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Michael J. Quirk Esq.

Attorney at MOTLEY RICE LLC

40 West Evergreen Avenue

Philadelphia, PA 19118-3324

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven James Boranian

101 2Nd Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gretchen M. Callas

500 Lee Street, E

Charleston, WV 25301

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Incorporated and McKesson Corporation to [ # 6 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [1001216060] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/22/2022 02:23 PM]

#16

(#16) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001215811] [22-1819] JCS [Entered: 08/22/2022 11:05 AM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE ISSUED to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Incorporated and McKesson Corporation requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 6 ] Response due 08/22/2022.[1001210467]. [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/11/2022 03:35 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001210354] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:31 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kim M. Watterson for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. [1001210352] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:29 PM]

#6

(#17) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Incorporated and McKesson Corporation to [ # 6 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [1001216060] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/22/2022 02:23 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. [1001229839] [22-1819, 22-1822] JCS [Entered: 09/14/2022 11:16 AM]

#19

(#21) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ] Number of days granted: 59. Opening brief and appendix due 12/01/2022. Response brief due 12/29/2022. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001225188] [22-1819, 22-1822] KH [Entered: 09/07/2022 09:32 AM]

#18

(#20) Joint MOTION by City of Huntington, West Virginia in 22-1819, Cabell County Commission in 22-1822 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until December 1, 2022.. Date and method of service: 09/06/2022 ecf. [1001224675] [22-1819, 22-1822] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 09/06/2022 01:45 PM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. [1001216530] [22-1819, 22-1822] JCS [Entered: 08/23/2022 09:14 AM]

#17

(#19) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, Russell Budd, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Jeffrey R. Gaddy, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Archie Cleveland Lamb Jr., J. Burton LeBlanc IV, Christian James Pistilli, Amy Quezon, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. For briefing orders issued on or after 7/15/2022, filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001216336] Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/03/2022. Response Brief due 10/31/2022. [22-1819, 22-1822] KH [Entered: 08/22/2022 05:20 PM]

#16

(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to consolidate case [ # 6 ] in 22-1819, [ # 1001209777-2 ] in 22-1822. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, Russell Budd, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Jeffrey R. Gaddy, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Archie Cleveland Lamb Jr., J. Burton LeBlanc IV, Christian James Pistilli, Amy Quezon, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. [1001216335] [22-1819, 22-1822] KH [Entered: 08/22/2022 05:17 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE ISSUED to Michael J. Quirk, Esq., Jason Lee Holliday re: change of address. [1001207310] [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/05/2022 04:16 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Louis Bograd for City of Huntington, West Virginia. [1001207156] [22-1819] Louis Bograd [Entered: 08/05/2022 03:04 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael J. Quirk for City of Huntington, West Virginia. [1001206780] [22-1819] Michael Quirk [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:49 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-01362. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Timothy Channing Hester, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Christian James Pistilli, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. [1001206748] [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:32 AM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-01362. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Timothy Channing Hester, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Christian James Pistilli, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. [1001206748] [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:32 AM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. [1001229839] [22-1819, 22-1822] JCS [Entered: 09/14/2022 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ] Number of days granted: 59. Opening brief and appendix due 12/01/2022. Response brief due 12/29/2022. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001225188] [22-1819, 22-1822] KH [Entered: 09/07/2022 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION by City of Huntington, West Virginia in 22-1819, Cabell County Commission in 22-1822 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until December 1, 2022.. Date and method of service: 09/06/2022 ecf. [1001224675] [22-1819, 22-1822] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 09/06/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. [1001216530] [22-1819, 22-1822] JCS [Entered: 08/23/2022 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, Russell Budd, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Jeffrey R. Gaddy, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Archie Cleveland Lamb Jr., J. Burton LeBlanc IV, Christian James Pistilli, Amy Quezon, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. For briefing orders issued on or after 7/15/2022, filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001216336] Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/03/2022. Response Brief due 10/31/2022. [22-1819, 22-1822] KH [Entered: 08/22/2022 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER filed granting Motion to consolidate case [ # 6 ] in 22-1819, [ # 1001209777-2 ] in 22-1822. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, Russell Budd, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Jeffrey R. Gaddy, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Archie Cleveland Lamb Jr., J. Burton LeBlanc IV, Christian James Pistilli, Amy Quezon, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. [1001216335] [22-1819, 22-1822] KH [Entered: 08/22/2022 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Incorporated and McKesson Corporation to [ # 6 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [1001216060] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/22/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [1001215811] [22-1819] JCS [Entered: 08/22/2022 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DOCKETING STATEMENT by City of Huntington, West Virginia.. [1001215311] [22-1819] Michael Quirk [Entered: 08/19/2022 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Huntington, West Virginia. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001215308] [22-1819] Michael Quirk [Entered: 08/19/2022 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul W. Schmidt for McKesson Corporation. [1001212090] [22-1819] Paul Schmidt [Entered: 08/15/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE ISSUED to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Incorporated and McKesson Corporation requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 6 ] Response due 08/22/2022.[1001210467]. [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/11/2022 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001210354] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kim M. Watterson for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. [1001210352] [22-1819] Kim Watterson [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by City of Huntington, West Virginia to consolidate case 22-1822 with 22-1819. Date and method of service: 08/10/2022 ecf. [1001209780] [22-1819] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 08/10/2022 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE ISSUED to Michael J. Quirk, Esq., Jason Lee Holliday re: change of address. [1001207310] [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/05/2022 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Louis Bograd for City of Huntington, West Virginia. [1001207156] [22-1819] Louis Bograd [Entered: 08/05/2022 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael J. Quirk for City of Huntington, West Virginia. [1001206780] [22-1819] Michael Quirk [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-01362. Mailed to: Donald Arbitblit, Andrew P. Arnold, Andrea Bierstein, Steven James Boranian, Maureen Frances Browne, David D. Burnett, Ronald G. Dove, Alison S. Gaffney, James Alexander Goold, Timothy Channing Hester, Dean Noburu Kawamoto, David J. Ko, Annie E. Kouba, Christian James Pistilli, Neil Kenneth Roman, Joshua David Tully. [1001206748] [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-01362. Case manager: KHancock. [1001206729] [22-1819] KH [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gretchen M. Callas