This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/20/2022 at 08:01:30 (UTC).

City of Annapolis v. BP P.L.C.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 City of Annapolis filed a Property - Land lawsuit against BP P L C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2101

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

CITY OF ANNAPOLIS

Defendant / Appellants

BP P.L.C.

BP AMERICA, INCORPORATED

BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INCORPORATED

CROWN CENTRAL LLC

CROWN CENTRAL NEW HOLDINGS LLC

CHEVRON CORPORATION

CHEVRON U.S.A. INCORPORATED

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

CITGO PETROLEUM CORPORATION

CONOCOPHILLIPS

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

PHILLIPS 66

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

MARATHON OIL COMPANY

MARATHON OIL CORPORATION

MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION

SPEEDWAY LLC

HESS CORPORATION

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Kendall Edling

Attorney at SHER EDLING LLP

100 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

David Michael Lyles

Attorney at CITY OF ANNAPOLIS OFFICE OF LAW

160 Duke Of Gloucester Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

Victor Marc Sher

Attorney at SHER EDLING LLP

100 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Heartney

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

John Bucher Isbister

Attorney at TYDINGS & ROSENBERG, LLP

1 East Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

John David Lombardo

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Jaime W. Luse

Attorney at TYDINGS & ROSENBERG, LLP

1 East Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Nancy G. Milburn

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

William Edward Thomson

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Tonya Kelly Cronin

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Andrea Ellen Neuman

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

Alison Schurick

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#94

(#76) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phillips 66 Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001280261] [22-2101] Steven Bauer [Entered: 12/09/2022 01:06 PM]

#93

(#75) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phillips 66. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001280258] [22-2101] Steven Bauer [Entered: 12/09/2022 01:03 PM]

#90

(#74) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rebecca Weinstein Bacon for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company in 22-2101, 22-2082. [1001271901] [22-2101, 22-2082] Rebecca Bacon [Entered: 11/23/2022 03:29 PM]

#89

(#73) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rebecca Weinstein Bacon for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company in 22-2082, 22-2101. [1001271850] [22-2082, 22-2101] Rebecca Bacon [Entered: 11/23/2022 02:50 PM]

#88

(#72) DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL by Appellants American Petroleum Institute, BP America, Incorporated, BP P.L.C., BP Products North America, Incorporated, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, CNX Resources Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, CONSOL Energy, Incorporated, Consol Marine Terminals LLC, Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Rosemore, Incorporated, Shell plc, Shell USA, Inc. and Speedway LLC in 22-2082, 22-2101. Name of lead counsel: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.. [1001269795] [22-2082, 22-2101] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:39 PM]

#87

(#71) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 70 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 01/09/2023. Response brief due 02/08/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001269035] [22-2082, 22-2101] CP [Entered: 11/21/2022 08:59 AM]

#86

(#70) MOTION by American Petroleum Institute, BP America, Incorporated, BP P.L.C., BP Products North America, Incorporated, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, CNX Resources Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, CONSOL Energy, Incorporated, Consol Marine Terminals LLC, Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Rosemore, Incorporated, Shell plc, Shell USA, Inc. and Speedway LLC in 22-2082, 22-2101 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until January 9, 2023.. Date and method of service: 11/18/2022 ecf. [1001268918] [22-2082, 22-2101] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/18/2022 07:29 PM]

#85

(#69) DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL by Appellee Anne Arundel County Maryland in 22-2082, Appellee City of Annapolis in 22-2101. Name of lead counsel: Victor M. Sher. [1001267333] [22-2082, 22-2101] Victor Sher [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:57 PM]

#84

(#68) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jonathan W. Hughes for BP P.L.C., BP America, Incorporated and BP Products North America, Incorporated. [1001264525] [22-2101] Jonathan Hughes [Entered: 11/11/2022 06:03 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David B. Hamilton for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [1001255666] [22-2101] David Hamilton [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:55 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jameson R. Jones for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [1001255657] [22-2101] Jameson Jones [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:13 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel R. Brody for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [1001255653] [22-2101] Daniel Brody [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:06 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrea E. Neuman for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255464] [22-2101] Andrea Neuman [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:54 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William E. Thomson for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255439] [22-2101] William Thomson [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:35 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas G. Hungar for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255437] [22-2101] Thomas Hungar [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:32 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255423] [22-2101] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:26 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00772-SAG. Mailed to: J. Benjamin Aguinaga, Yahonnes Cleary, Joshua D. Dick, Robert E. Dunn, Daniella Adar Einik, Caitlin Grusauskas, Kyle S. Kushner, Lisa S. Meyer, Matthew J. Peters, Martin D. Quinones, Diana Reiter, Katherine Ann Rouse. [1001253852] [22-2101] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 09:51 AM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00772-SAG. Mailed to: J. Benjamin Aguinaga, Yahonnes Cleary, Joshua D. Dick, Robert E. Dunn, Daniella Adar Einik, Caitlin Grusauskas, Kyle S. Kushner, Lisa S. Meyer, Matthew J. Peters, Martin D. Quinones, Diana Reiter, Katherine Ann Rouse. [1001253852] [22-2101] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 09:51 AM]

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phillips 66 Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001280261] [22-2101] Steven Bauer [Entered: 12/09/2022 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phillips 66. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001280258] [22-2101] Steven Bauer [Entered: 12/09/2022 01:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rebecca Weinstein Bacon for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company in 22-2101, 22-2082. [1001271901] [22-2101, 22-2082] Rebecca Bacon [Entered: 11/23/2022 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rebecca Weinstein Bacon for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company in 22-2082, 22-2101. [1001271850] [22-2082, 22-2101] Rebecca Bacon [Entered: 11/23/2022 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL by Appellants American Petroleum Institute, BP America, Incorporated, BP P.L.C., BP Products North America, Incorporated, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, CNX Resources Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, CONSOL Energy, Incorporated, Consol Marine Terminals LLC, Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Rosemore, Incorporated, Shell plc, Shell USA, Inc. and Speedway LLC in 22-2082, 22-2101. Name of lead counsel: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.. [1001269795] [22-2082, 22-2101] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 70 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 01/09/2023. Response brief due 02/08/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001269035] [22-2082, 22-2101] CP [Entered: 11/21/2022 08:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION by American Petroleum Institute, BP America, Incorporated, BP P.L.C., BP Products North America, Incorporated, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, CNX Resources Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, CONSOL Energy, Incorporated, Consol Marine Terminals LLC, Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Rosemore, Incorporated, Shell plc, Shell USA, Inc. and Speedway LLC in 22-2082, 22-2101 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until January 9, 2023.. Date and method of service: 11/18/2022 ecf. [1001268918] [22-2082, 22-2101] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 11/18/2022 07:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL by Appellee Anne Arundel County Maryland in 22-2082, Appellee City of Annapolis in 22-2101. Name of lead counsel: Victor M. Sher. [1001267333] [22-2082, 22-2101] Victor Sher [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jonathan W. Hughes for BP P.L.C., BP America, Incorporated and BP Products North America, Incorporated. [1001264525] [22-2101] Jonathan Hughes [Entered: 11/11/2022 06:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Diana E. Reiter for BP P.L.C., BP America, Incorporated and BP Products North America, Incorporated. [1001264523] [22-2101] Diana Reiter [Entered: 11/11/2022 05:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ConocoPhillips. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001255668] [22-2101] David Hamilton [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David B. Hamilton for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [1001255666] [22-2101] David Hamilton [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jameson R. Jones for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [1001255657] [22-2101] Jameson Jones [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel R. Brody for ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [1001255653] [22-2101] Daniel Brody [Entered: 10/26/2022 06:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrea E. Neuman for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255464] [22-2101] Andrea Neuman [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William E. Thomson for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255439] [22-2101] William Thomson [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas G. Hungar for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255437] [22-2101] Thomas Hungar [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Incorporated. [1001255423] [22-2101] Theodore Boutrous [Entered: 10/26/2022 03:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00772-SAG. Mailed to: J. Benjamin Aguinaga, Yahonnes Cleary, Joshua D. Dick, Robert E. Dunn, Daniella Adar Einik, Caitlin Grusauskas, Kyle S. Kushner, Lisa S. Meyer, Matthew J. Peters, Martin D. Quinones, Diana Reiter, Katherine Ann Rouse. [1001253852] [22-2101] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 09:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00772-SAG. Case manager: CPoulsen. [1001253826] [22-2101] CP [Entered: 10/25/2022 09:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Central LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Citgo Petroleum Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant