This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/24/2023 at 06:04:00 (UTC).

City and County of San Francisco, et al v. BP PLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2022 City and County of San Francisco, filed a Property - Land lawsuit against BP PLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16812

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, a Municipal Corporation

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the San Francisco City Attorney

Defendant / Appellants

BP PLC, a public limited company of England and Wales

CHEVRON CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY, a Delaware corporation

CONOCOPHILLIPS

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation

SHELL, PLC, a public limited company of England and Wales, FKA Royal Dutch Shell PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ronald Lee

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney's Office

1390 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Victor Marc Sher

Attorney at Sher Edling, LLP

100 Montgomery Street, Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Barbara Jane Chisholm

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Matthew Kendall Edling Esquire

Attorney at Sher Edling, LLP

100 Montgomery Street, Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sara J. Eisenberg

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney's Office

1390 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Alexander Justin Holtzman

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney's Office

1390 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Quentin C. Karpilow Esquire

Attorney at Sher Edling, LLP

100 Montgomery Street, Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Martin Daniel Quinones

Attorney at Sher Edling, LLP

100 Montgomery Street, Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael Rubin

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew T. Heartney

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Jonathan W. Hughes

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

John D. Lombardo

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP

777 S Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Nancy G. Milburn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Joshua D. Dick

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Erica W. Harris

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Neal Stuart Manne

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Andrea Ellen Neuman Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

William Edward Thomson Esquire III

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Daniel R. Brody

Attorney at Bartlit Beck, LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#11

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Docket(#25) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Entered in error (wrong case). Filed correctly in case 22-16912. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Received copy of District Court order filed on 01/04/2022. Denying Motion requesting district court to adhere to FRAP as to Brian Keith Wright (1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability for this courts previous orders denying Wrights 2255 motion and his motion requesting this court to grant 2255 due to governments consent is DENIED [12622512] (NAC) [Entered: 01/04/2023 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#24) Added Attorney(s) Daniel J. Toal, Theodore V. Wells Jr., Kannon K. Shanmugam, William Thomas Marks for party(s) Appellant Exxon Mobil Corporation, in case 22-16812. [12605349] (NAC) [Entered: 12/08/2022 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#23) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William T. Marks (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 2001 K Street NW Washington, D.C. 20006-1047) for Appellant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Date of service: 12/08/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12605220] [22-16812] (Marks, William) [Entered: 12/08/2022 10:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#22) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel J. Toal (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 1285 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019) for Appellant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Date of service: 12/08/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12605209] [22-16812] (Toal, Daniel) [Entered: 12/08/2022 10:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#21) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kannon K. Shanmugam (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 2001 K Street NW Washington, D.C. 20006-1047) for Appellant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Date of service: 12/08/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12605201] [22-16812] (Shanmugam, Kannon) [Entered: 12/08/2022 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#20) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Theodore V. Wells, Jr. (Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, 1285 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019) for Appellant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Date of service: 12/08/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12605179] [22-16812] (Wells, Theodore) [Entered: 12/08/2022 09:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#19) Added Attorney(s) Robb W. Kapla, Yvonne Mere for party(s) Appellee People of the State of California Appellee City and County of San Francisco, in case 22-16812. [12602330] (NAC) [Entered: 12/05/2022 01:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#18) Added Attorney(s) Thomas G. Hungar for party(s) Appellant Chevron Corporation, in case 22-16812. [12602327] (NAC) [Entered: 12/05/2022 01:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Yvonne Rosil Mere (Office of the City Attorney, 1 Dr Carlton B Goodlett Pl, Ste 234, San Francisco, CA 94102-4604) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 12/05/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12602305] [22-16812] (Mere, Yvonne) [Entered: 12/05/2022 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robb William Kapla (San Francisco City Attorney's Office, 1 Dr Carlton B Goodlett Pl, Ste 234, San Francisco, CA 94102-4604) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 12/05/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12602287] [22-16812] (Kapla, Robb) [Entered: 12/05/2022 01:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Matthew Kendall Edling, Quentin C. Karpilow for party(s) Appellee People of the State of California Appellee City and County of San Francisco, in case 22-16812. [12598588] (NAC) [Entered: 11/30/2022 07:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Quentin C. Karpilow (Sher Edling LLP 100 Montgomery St., Ste. 1410 SF CA 94104) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 11/29/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12598520] [22-16812] (Karpilow, Quentin) [Entered: 11/29/2022 05:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew K. Edling (Sher Edling LLP 100 Montgomery St., Ste. 1410 SF CA 94104) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 11/29/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12598510] [22-16812] (Edling, Matthew) [Entered: 11/29/2022 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney Victor Marc Sher for Appellees People of the State of California and City and County of San Francisco, in case 22-16812. [12598467] (HH) [Entered: 11/29/2022 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Victor Marc Sher (Sher Edling LLP 100 Montgomery St., Ste. 1410, SF CA 94104) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 11/29/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12598452] [22-16812] (Sher, Victor) [Entered: 11/29/2022 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Barbara Jane Chisholm for party(s) Appellee People of the State of California Appellee City and County of San Francisco, in case 22-16812. [12598115] (NAC) [Entered: 11/29/2022 01:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Barbara J. Chisholm (Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street, Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 11/29/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12598109] [22-16812] (Chisholm, Barbara) [Entered: 11/29/2022 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Michael Rubin for party(s) Appellee People of the State of California Appellee City and County of San Francisco, in case 22-16812. [12598092] (NAC) [Entered: 11/29/2022 01:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Rubin (Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street, Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108) for Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California. Date of service: 11/29/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12598084] [22-16812] (Rubin, Michael) [Entered: 11/29/2022 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Shell, PLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/02/2022. Transcript ordered by 12/21/2022. Transcript due 01/20/2023. Appellants BP PLC, Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Shell, PLC opening brief due 03/01/2023. Appellees City and County of San Francisco and People of the State of California answering brief due 03/31/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12595723] (JBS) [Entered: 11/25/2022 11:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shell is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BP, P.L.C. is a litigant