This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 05:05:55 (UTC).

City and County of San Franci v. USEPA

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 City and County of San Franci filed an Other lawsuit against USEPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-70282

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Respondent

U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Richard Scott Davis Esquire

Attorney at Beveridge & Diamond, PC

1900 N Street Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20036

Andrew Christopher Silton

Attorney at Beveridge & Diamond, PC

1900 N Street Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20036

Respondent Attorney

Jessica O'Donnell

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Petition For Review

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Petitioner City and County of San Francisco Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/16/2021. Petitioner brief due 04/30/2021 for City and County of San Francisco. Respondent brief due 06/01/2021 for U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11997955] (WL) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Scott Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew C Silton